City of Sweetwater, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Sweetwater, Florida
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and CVS Health Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019op45914
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Health Corp. waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/13/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-23849. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-115) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-115) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Administrative Order Closing Case. This case is STAYED pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT (complete complaint) against CITY OF SWEETWATER, FLORIDA, filed by CITY OF SWEETWATER, FLORIDA.(Romano, John) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Striking #1 Complaint filed by CITY OF SWEETWATER, FLORIDA by CITY OF SWEETWATER, FLORIDA (Romano, John) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds) [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 (STRICKEN PER DE#3 Amended Complaint Filed)COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11986020, filed by CITY OF SWEETWATER, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Romano, John)Text Modified on 9/16/2019 (cqs). [Transferred from flsd on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sweetwater, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sweetwater, Florida
Represented By: Daryl Lafayette Jones
Represented By: John Fletcher Romano
Represented By: J. Eric Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?