Prince George County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Prince George County, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Henry Schein Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45929
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 Amended complaint against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., CVS TN Distribution, Cardinal Health Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Henry Schein Inc., Insource, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) Mylan Institutional, Inc., Indivior, Inc., Virginia CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgren Eastern Co., Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CaremarkPCS, LLC, Walmart, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., and Eckerd Corporation. Filed by Prince George County, Virginia. (Sharp, Kevin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint Subject to Plaintiffs' Objections to Federal Jurisdiction filed by Prince George County, Virginia. (Sharp, Kevin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00458. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Prince George County, Virginia. (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 MDL TRANSFER ORDER. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time. A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/2/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, HI/1:19-cv-00377, MIE/2:19-cv-11681, MIE/2:19-cv-11685, MIE/2:19-cv-11687, MOE/4:19-cv-01654, MOE/4:19-cv-01722, MOE/4:19-cv-01911, NJ/1:19-cv-13684, NYE/2:19-cv-03800, NYN/1:19-cv-00789, NYN/8:19-cv-00782, NYW/6:19-cv-06490, OKN/4:19-cv-00380, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256, TXS/4:19-cv-02504, VAE/1:19-cv-00778, VAE/2:19-cv-00331, VAE/3:19-cv-00457, VAE/3:19-cv-00458, VAE/3:19-cv-00459, VAE/3:19-cv-00513, VAW/3:19-cv-00037, VAW/4:19-cv-00029 (CMD) (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Because both Plaintiff and Defendants represent that this matter will likely be transferred to the MDL, the Court STAYS this matter until October 21, 2019. The Parties SHALL file a status report explaining whether this matter will be transferred to MDL no later than October 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/21/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Status Report by Express Scripts, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Specgx LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hilton and Dillon Stay Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 - Final Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Wave Cases, #5 Exhibit 5 - All Stay Orders)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Prince George County, Virginia. (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - For good cause shown, it is hereby ADJUDGED, ORDERED and DECREED that Lauren Tallent Rogers, Esquire is permitted to withdraw from the case and is hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/01/2019. (smej, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Prince George County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Court STAYS this matter for 60 days. The Parties SHALL file a status report explaining whether this matter will be transferred to MDL no later than August 14, 2019. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/21/2019. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Prince George County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Prince George County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated of Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6701378.), filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince George County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince George County, Virginia
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Represented By: Kevin H. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?