Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County v. Sackler et al
Plaintiff: Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, David A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt and Richard S. Sackler
Case Number: 1:2019op45963
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-08686. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/23/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference. ENDORSEMENT: In view of the MDL transfer order, the conference is vacated and the Clerk is directed to administratively close the case in this district. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/23/2019) (ks) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/26/2019) (jwh) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Lauren Kain Whaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Richard L. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Richard L. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #6 MOTION for Lauren Kain Whaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Lauren Kain Whaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kain, Lauren) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Richard L. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Richard) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Allen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Allen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Lauren Kain Whaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17623636. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #3 MOTION for Richard L. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17623520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Lauren Kain Whaley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17623636. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Lauren Kain Whaley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Lauren Kain Whaley, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Allen, Richard) Modified on 9/19/2019 (wb). [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Richard L. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17623520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard L. Allen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Richard L. Allen, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Allen, Richard) Modified on 9/19/2019 (wb). [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Allen, Richard) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David A Sackler, Jonathan D Sackler, Kathe A Sackler, Mortimer D A Sackler, Richard S Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17623376)Document filed by Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County.(Allen, Richard) [Transferred from nysd on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County v. Sackler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Initiative Health Authority for Los Angeles County
Represented By: Lauren R Kain
Represented By: Richard Allen
Represented By: Richard L. Allen
Represented By: Lauren R. Kain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?