City of Ocoee, Florida v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: City of Ocoee, Florida
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cephalon Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Walmart Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and CVS Health Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019op45966
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Health Corp. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, J.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 6:19-cv-01919. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number: MDL-2804 (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/17/2019. (Ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/17/2019. (ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:19-cv-1919-Orl-37EJK. Judge Gregory A. Presnell no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/15/2019. (LAM) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2408, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 10/28/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1919-Orl-31EJK. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16000922) filed by City of Ocoee, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Romano, Eric) Modified on 10/8/2019 (RDO). [Transferred from flmd on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Ocoee, Florida v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ocoee, Florida
Represented By: Eric Romano
Represented By: J. Eric Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?