County of Kleberg v. CVS Health et al
Plaintiff: County of Kleberg
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Walgreen Co, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., CVS Health, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Endo International plc, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Walmart Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op46159
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 42 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-02815. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 41 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Setting as to #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #16 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy, #7 MOTION to Remand. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - The Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., and Actavis LLC to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference, initially scheduled for November 15, 2019, and report are continued, and will be rescheduled following either (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL (Case No. 2804) or (2) entry of an order with this Court's ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, as necessary. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #23 Response in Opposition to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal, filed by Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Knoll Pharmaceutical Company to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkes, John) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ledwards, 4). [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Amerisource Bergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #24 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Lewis) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #16 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time for Allergan Finance, LLC to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and to Continue Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Allergan Finance, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 Other EXHIBITS re: #25 Notice (Other) by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Intent to File an Opposition Memorandum in Response to Kleberg County's "Opposition" to Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition( Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019.), Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 Opposed RESPONSE to #18 Notice (Other) In Support of Removal, filed by County of Kleberg. (Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to County of Kleberg served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Walmart Stores Inc served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Stores Inc, filed.(Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE (Supplemental) in Support of Removal by Walmart Stores Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scofield, Elizabeth) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, filed by County of Kleberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Dkt 50 Johnson Co. vs. Purdue)(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy( Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019.) by County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Proposed Order)(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Amerisource Bergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Stores Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by County of Kleberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Regarding Remands, #2 Exhibit Case Management Order One)(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Stay by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #7 MOTION to Remand by County of Kleberg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by County of Kleberg, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2019. (Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mallinckrodt, PLC, filed.(McCleary, Roger) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by County of Kleberg, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22892792) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Kleberg v. CVS Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Alfred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Represented By: John Laurens Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Kleberg
Represented By: Michael James Krueger
Represented By: Kira Talip Sanchez
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?