City of Poughkeepsie v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Poughkeepsie
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Walgreen Co, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, Discount Drug Mart, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, Watson Laboratories Inc., HBC Service Company, Allergan PLC, Rite Aid Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., SAJ Distributors, Actavis LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Beverly Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, David A. Sackler, Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., PSS World Medical Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Raymond Sackler Family, John N. Kapoor, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Bellco Drug Corp., Walgreen Eastern Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Miami-Luken Inc, Theresa Sackler, MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY, Anda Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Henry Schein Inc., Sandoz Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Darby Group Companies, Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Jonathan D. Sackler, Actavis Inc, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Blenheim Pharmacal Inc., Value Drug Company, Purdue Pharma Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op46163
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Publix Supermarkets, Inc. filed by City of Poughkeepsie. (Badala, Salvatore)
December 31, 2019 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of City of Poughkeepsie. (Badala, Salvatore)
December 31, 2019 Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of City of Poughkeepsie. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
December 31, 2019 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of City of Poughkeepsie. (Sacks, Shayna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-06800. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
December 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Victor Marrero for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. Document filed by City of Poughkeepsie. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation.(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Hunter. J. Shkolnik dated 8/23/2019 re: Respectfully request that this Court deny CVS' s request to move for a stay and proceed with the hearing on remand before transfer of the case to the Multi-District Litigation (MDL) in the Northern District of Ohio. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/26/2019) (kv) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Accordingly, upon review of the foregoing correspondence and other materials of record in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that the time for defendants to answer, or otherwise respond in a matter consistent with this Court's Individual Practices, to the Complaint is hereby extended to thirty days after the ruling of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "JPMDL") upon the Transfer Motion as defined above; and it is further ORDERED that the Remand Motion (Dkt. No. 16) is DENIED without prejudice to its being refiled here, or in the Northern District of Ohio, upon the JPMDL granting or denying the Transfer Motion; and it is further ORDERED that the motion of defendant CVS Health Corporation for a temporary stay in this matter is DENIED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/23/2019) (jca) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Shawn P. Naunton dated 8/21/2019 re: respectfully request a conference concerning a non-dispositive motion. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant CVS Health Corp. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/23/2019) (rro) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendants. So ordered. dated 8/22/2019 re: For these reasons, the Defendants respectfully request that the Court grant this application on consent and enter an order extending the time for the Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(:f) planning conference until thirty (30) days following: (1) a final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling qn Plaintiff's motion to remand, whichever is later. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendants. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/23/2019) (js) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Hunter J. Shkolnik dated 8/22/2019 re: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff respectfully requests that this Court grant Plaintiff's request for an expedited hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Montgomery as soon as possible. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Plaintiff. so Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/23/2019) (js) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, counsel for plaintiff and counsel for the defendants identified below, represented by the undersigned counsel: 1. A copy of a Summons and the operative Complaint in this action shall be deemed to have been served upon the defendants identified below effective as of July 30, 2019. 2. The defendants identified below hereby waive any objections they may have to the manner of service of the Summons and Complaint in this action; provided, however, that defendants retain all other objections and defenses, including, but not limited to, lack of personal jurisdiction. 3. This Stipulation does not affect any existing dates or deadlines in this action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/23/2019) (js) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by City of Poughkeepsie. Return Date set for 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - NY Transfer Order)(Shkolnik, Hunter) Modified on 11/4/2019 (db). [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer requesting that the Court grant this application on consent and enter an order extending the time for Value Drug Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint and to conduct the Rule 26(f) planning conference until 60 days following: (1) a final decision by the JPML on transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, whichever is later addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Nelson Perel dated 08/21/2019. Document filed by Value Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A)(Perel, Nelson) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nelson Perel on behalf of Value Drug Company. (Perel, Nelson) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp.. Document filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp..(Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Edward Asfendis on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Bellco Drug Corp.. (Asfendis, Paul) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Victor Marrero. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cardinal Health Inc..(Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin P. Mulry on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc.. (Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Notice of Removal and the Complaint therein, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kurt M. Mullen dated July 31, 2019. Document filed by John N. Kapoor.(Mullen, Kurt) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 30, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Notice of Removal and the Complaint therein on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center; and Walmart Inc. addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Shawn P. Naunton dated 7/29/2019. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference))(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Notice of Removal and the Complaint therein, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kevin P. Mulry dated July 26, 2019. Document filed by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference)(Mulry, Kevin) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt Michael Mullen on behalf of John N. Kapoor. (Mullen, Kurt) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17310663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17310663. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Md, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Pa, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Dutchess. Case Number: 2019-51786..Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (MDL Transfer Order))(Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shawn Patrick Naunton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Dutchess. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shawn Patrick Naunton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., City of Poughkeepsie, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Shawn Patrick Naunton to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME AND SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Naunton, Shawn) [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Dutchess County. Case Number: 2019-51786. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17288754).Document filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Naunton, Shawn) Modified on 7/23/2019 (pne). [Transferred from nysd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Poughkeepsie v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Mulry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER SACKLER FAMILY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Group Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blenheim Pharmacal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Represented By: Nelson Perel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?