East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Mylan N.V., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Abbvie Products LLC, Actavis Inc and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019op46164
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Frank H. Spruiell, Jr filed by on behalf of Morris and Dickson Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank)
February 17, 2020 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Actavis Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (P,R)
February 12, 2020 Filing 24 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Rider)(Kanner, Allan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Mylan N.V. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Mylan Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Abbott Laboratories waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. AbbVie Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. Abbvie Products LLC waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020 filed on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office (Kanner, Allan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Allan Kanner filed by on behalf of East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office. (Kanner, Allan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00824. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KAH) [Transferred from lamd on 12/31/2019.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (KAH) [Transferred from lamd on 12/31/2019.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Allan Kanner regarding Annemieke M. Tennis who is Co-Counsel for party East Baton Rouge Clerk of Court Office. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/31/2019.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/31/2019.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2037737.), filed by EAST BATON ROUGE PARISH CLERK OF COURT OFFICE. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Kanner, Allan) [Transferred from lamd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court Office
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: John Carroll Walsh
Represented By: Benjamin David Beychok
Represented By: Conlee S. Whiteley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?