Dennis v. May
Petitioner: Reeco Dennis
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 1:2020cv00171
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Mary Anne Reese filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Reese, Mary)
February 4, 2020 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to: Ohio Attorney General, 30 E. Broad St., 14th Floor, Columbus, OH 43215; Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) and #5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to: Warden, Harold May, Richland Correctional Institution, 1001 S Olivesburg Road, Mansfield, OH 44905; and, Copy of #5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to: Petitioner Reeco Dennis #680-469, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 2/4/2020. (D,JJ)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Respondent shall file an Answer (Return of Writ) to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order; Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's Return of Writ to file a Reply (Traverse); Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond thereto. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 2/4/2020. (D,JJ)
February 4, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2.. Judge James S. Gwin on 2/4/2020. (S,KM)
January 29, 2020 Copy of #4 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Reeco Dennis #680-469, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 1/29/2020. (D,JJ)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 1/29/2020. (D,JJ)
January 24, 2020 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a)., Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Reeco Dennis at P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 1/27/2020. (B,R)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Reeco Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Court Certification)(B,R)
January 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
January 24, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Reeco Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (first page), #2 Envelope) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reeco Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?