Mr. D's Detail Hand Car Wash v. City of Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: Mr. D's Detail Hand Car Wash
Defendant: Terrace Construction Co., Inc., City of Cleveland, City of Cleveland Office of Capital Projects and City of Cleveland Division of Streets
Case Number: 1:2020cv00204
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/20/2020 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr.Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/5/2020. (R,Sh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Terrace Construction Co., Inc.. (O'Sullivan, Cornelius)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant City of Cleveland's #7 Motion for extension of time until 04/03/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. City of Cleveland answer due 4/3/2020. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/4/2020.(R,Sh)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until 04/03/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant City of Cleveland. (Shafer, Leslie)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
January 31, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
January 31, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet to Supplement Notice of Removal filed by City of Cleveland. Related document(s) #1 .(Shafer, Leslie)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Removal filed by Terrace Construction Co., Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(O'Sullivan, Cornelius)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 City of Cleveland Office of Capital Projects Consent to Removal filed by City of Cleveland Office of Capital Projects. Related document(s) #1 .(Shafer, Leslie)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 City of Cleveland Division of Streets Consent to Removal filed by City of Cleveland Division of Streets. Related document(s) #1 .(Shafer, Leslie)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-926868 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9754108.. Filed by City of Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Journal Entry, #4 Exhibit Docket) (Shafer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. D's Detail Hand Car Wash v. City of Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrace Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius J. O'Sullivan
Represented By: Joshua M. Miklowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland
Represented By: Leslie J. Shafer
Represented By: Craig J. Morice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland Office of Capital Projects
Represented By: Leslie J. Shafer
Represented By: Craig J. Morice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland Division of Streets
Represented By: Leslie J. Shafer
Represented By: Craig J. Morice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. D's Detail Hand Car Wash
Represented By: David N. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?