State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Sandhu, et al.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Fair Housing Advocates Association, Anoopinder Sandhu, Surjit S. Sandhu, William Strait and Cathy Strait
Case Number: 1:2020cv00252
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Fair Housing Advocates Association waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Englert, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Cathy Strait waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Englert, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. William Strait waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Englert, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Anoopinder Sandhu waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Englert, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Surjit S. Sandhu waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 filed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Englert, James)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Separate Joint Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Anoopinder Sandhu, Surjit S. Sandhu, Cathy Strait, William Strait. (Collins, Tim)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Katie E. Christman filed by on behalf of Anoopinder Sandhu, Surjit S. Sandhu, Cathy Strait, William Strait. (Christman, Katie)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Tim L. Collins filed by on behalf of Anoopinder Sandhu, Surjit S. Sandhu, Cathy Strait, William Strait. (Collins, Tim)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Englert, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9767946. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action, case number 1:19cv696 Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Englert, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Sandhu, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: John F. McLaughlin
Represented By: James J. Englert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fair Housing Advocates Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoopinder Sandhu
Represented By: T. Kinsey McInturf
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Katie E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surjit S. Sandhu
Represented By: T. Kinsey McInturf
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Katie E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Strait
Represented By: T. Kinsey McInturf
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Katie E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Strait
Represented By: T. Kinsey McInturf
Represented By: Tim L. Collins
Represented By: Katie E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?