Howe, et al v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: George Jeffrey Howe and Brenda Howe
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00274
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 Certified copy of Order of Remand, docket sheet, and Court record mailed to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Y,A)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/14/2020 granting defendant's Motion to withdraw Notice of Removal and remanding action to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (Related Doc #5 #1 )(S,KM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to withdraw Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Ankuda, Christopher)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Certified copy of State Court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (J,G)
February 7, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. (Y,A)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/7/2020. (L,Ja)
February 7, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Progressive Casualty Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
February 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
February 7, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 WITHDRAWN Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-927749 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9772369. Filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaints and Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morway, Paul) Modified on 2/14/2020 (S,KM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe, et al v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jeffrey Howe
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Heller
Represented By: Jamie R. Lebovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Howe
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Heller
Represented By: Jamie R. Lebovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul R. Morway
Represented By: Christopher J. Ankuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?