Wheller v. University Hospitals Health System
Plaintiff: Lucille Wheller
Defendant: University Hospitals Health System
Case Number: 1:2020cv00276
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Stipulation and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/23/2020. The Court approves dismissal with prejudice of all claims. The Court retains jurisdiction over any disputes arising from or relating to this matter. re #6 (S,KM)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by University Hospitals Health System. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, James)
March 16, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of case management conference on 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James S. Gwin. Conference information to be provided by email. (S,KM)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/18/2020 setting case management conference on 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Appendix 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by University Hospitals Health System. (Smith, James)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
February 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
February 7, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by University Hospitals Health System. (Shelley, Inna)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-916580 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9772991.. Filed by University Hospitals Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Inna Shelley in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelley, Inna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheller v. University Hospitals Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Wheller
Represented By: Stephan I. Voudris
Represented By: Christopher M. Sams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Hospitals Health System
Represented By: James P. Smith
Represented By: Inna Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?