UH Cleveland Medical Center v. UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Plaintiff: UH Cleveland Medical Center
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00286
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, without prejudice. Related document #6 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/6/2020. (R,Sh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by UH Cleveland Medical Center. (Williams, Michael s/by John F. Garswood)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order granting the parties #4 Stipulation (Motion) for an Extension of time to Move or Plead. UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. answer due 3/5/2020. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/20/2020. (R,Sh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Certified copies of State Court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (Y,A)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Stipulation Of Extension To Move Or Plead filed by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
February 11, 2020 Filing fee in the amount of $400 received from Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP. Receipt # 14660121196 (Y,A)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
February 10, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
February 10, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. filed by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. (B,R)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-927389 Filing fee not paid. Filed by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State of Ohio Authorized List of Insurance Companies, #2 Exhibit B. Jurisdiction Wisconsin, #3 Exhibit C. Notice of Filing, #4 Exhibit D. State Court Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing fee mailed 2/10/2020. (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UH Cleveland Medical Center v. UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UH Cleveland Medical Center
Represented By: Emily J. Viscomi
Represented By: John F. Garswood, IV
Represented By: Michael T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Represented By: Amber L. Merl
Represented By: Katheryn M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?