Jones et al v. Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Jones, Janet Jones, Catherine Martin, Douglas Cochrane and Donna Baker
Defendant: Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co., Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc., Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc. and Lubrizol Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00511
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to adjust schedule and page limitations (Related Doc #25 . Defendants' answers to and/or motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are due by October 2, 2020. Plaintiffs' responses to any motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are due by December 3, 2020. Defendants' replies to any motion to dismiss responses are due by January 8, 2021. Page limitation for any motion to dismiss and response are set to 40 pages. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/8/2020.(L,Ja)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint Motion to Adjust Schedule and Page Limitations to 40 pages filed by Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co., Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc. (Bollin, Kip). Added Motion for leave to exceed page limitations on 9/4/2020 (J,G).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion for attorney Robert Kent Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10227631, filed by Defendant Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Kent Warren)(Bollin, Kip)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion for attorney Bradley Reid Kutrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10227560, filed by Defendant Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley Reid Kutrow)(Bollin, Kip)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert K Warren for Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #24 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/31/2020.(L,Ja)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Bradley R. Kutrow for Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #23 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/31/2020.(L,Ja)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc. on 8/17/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #20 . (L,Br)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Lubrizol Corporation waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Karon, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7017 1070 0000 2037 6203. (J,G)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc.. (H,SP)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] rendering moot Defendant's Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Related Doc #14 )and Defendant's Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Related Doc #15 ). (Related Document, Amended Complaint Doc #17 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/4/2020.(L,Ja)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons upon Cresline Plastic Pipe Co., Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cresline Summons) (Karon, Daniel)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FILING ERROR: Attorney refiled corrected praecipe doc #19 . Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons upon Cresline Plastic Pipe Co., Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cresline Summons) (Karon, Daniel) Modified on 8/4/2020 (S,AN).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) Douglas Cochrane and new party defendant(s) The Lubrizol Corporation and Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc.. Filed by Kevin Jones, Janet Jones. (Karon, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Joint Motion to Adjust Briefing Schedule (Doc. No. #16 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' motions to dismiss or Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(B) amendment are due by July 29, 2020. If Plaintiffs respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss, then Defendants' replies are due by August 28, 2020. If Plaintiffs amend pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(1)(1)(B), then Defendants' answers to, or motions to dismiss the amended complaint are due by September 15, 2020. Plaintiffs' responses to any motions to dismiss the amended complaint are due by November 13, 2020, and Defendants' replies to any motions to dismiss responses are due by December 14, 2020. The parties are given leave to file memoranda in support of their motions and responses that are 30 pages in length. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/9/2020.(L,Ja)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint Motion to adjust briefing schedule filed by Janet Jones, Kevin Jones. (Karon, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support - of Charlotte Pipe Foundry's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A. - Charlotte Pipe and Foundry Company Limited Warranty, #3 Exhibit B. - FlowGuard Gold Limited Warranty)(Bollin, Kip)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) filed by Defendant Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Lauderdale, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. (Bollin, Kip)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendant's Motion to exceed page limitations by 10 pages (Related Doc #13 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/18/2020.(L,Ja)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.. (Bollin, Kip)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent Lubrizol Advanced Materials International, LLC, Corporate Parent Lubrizol Overseas Trading Corporation, Corporate Parent The Lubrizol Corporation for Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. filed by Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc.. (Lauderdale, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel for Defendant, by Nada G. Faddoul filed by on behalf of Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. (Faddoul, Nada)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Attorney Appearance as Lead Counsel for Defendant, by Jeffrey J. Lauderdale filed by on behalf of Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. (Lauderdale, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants' answer to class action complaint due May 29, 2020. Plaintiffs' response to any motion to dismiss due July 29, 2020. Defendants' reply in support of motion to dismiss due August 28, 2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/24/2020.(L,Ja)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint Motion for extension of time until 5/29/2020 for Defendants' response to Complaint, until 7/29/2020 for Plaintiffs' response to any motion to dismiss, and until 8/28/2020 for Defendants' reply filed by Defendant Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co. (Bollin, Kip)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. on 3/12/2020, filed on behalf of Kevin Jones; Janet Jones Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co. on 3/13/2020, filed on behalf of Kevin Jones; Janet Jones Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for attorney Brendan Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9855329, filed by Janet Jones, Kevin Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Thompson Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Brendan Thompson PHV Proposed Order)(Karon, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brendan S. Thompson for Janet Jones and for Kevin Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/12/2020.(L,Ja)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for attorney Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9849429, filed by Janet Jones, Kevin Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deutsch Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Karon, Daniel)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for attorney Jacob M. Polokoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9849409, filed by Janet Jones, Kevin Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Polokoff Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Karon, Daniel)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jacob M. Polakoff for Janet Jones and Kevin Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/10/2020.(L,Ja)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lawrence Deutsch for Janet Jones,and Kevin Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/10/2020.(L,Ja)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co., Receipt # 7017 1070 0000 2037 6227, Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc., Receipt # 7017 1070 0000 2037 6210, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,MI)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co., Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9840908. Filed by Kevin Jones, Janet Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Lubrizol Summons, #3 Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Summons) (Karon, Daniel) .
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Pipe & Foundry Co.
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Represented By: Carolyn M. Cole
Represented By: Robert K. Warren
Represented By: Bradley R. Kutrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Nada G. Faddoul
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cresline Plastic Pipe Co. Inc.
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubrizol Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jones
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Brendan S. Thompson
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jones
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Brendan S. Thompson
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Martin
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Brendan S. Thompson
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Cochrane
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Brendan S. Thompson
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Baker
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Brendan S. Thompson
Represented By: Jacob M. Polakoff
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?