Hoston v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rhea Hoston
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00549
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulation and Order of Case Dismissal, with prejudice, with parties to bear their own costs. The court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement for a period of 90 days. Re #9 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 4/29/2020. (R,Sh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2020: #1 Revised Stipulation and Order) (R,Sh).
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulation of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice filed by Rhea Hoston. (Rodriguez, Angela)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be sent by separate e-mail. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 4/28/2020. (R,Sh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Howard, J.)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 26, 2020 to answer Complaint. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. answer due 3/26/2020. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/19/2020.(R,Sh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 26, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howard, J.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
March 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
March 12, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Howard, J.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement adding parent company Sedgwick, L.P. filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Howard, J.) Modified to add parent company on 3/17/2020 (B,R).
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Cuyahoga County, case number CV20929204 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9855694.. Filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed in state court, #2 Exhibit State court journal entry, #3 Exhibit State court notice of removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Howard, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoston v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: J. Gordon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhea Hoston
Represented By: Angela L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?