Oppenheimer v. Hippsley, et al.
Plaintiff: Oppenheimer, David A. Oppenheimer and David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Hippsley, Hadden R Hippsley, Lambda Tours, Inc. and Hadden R. Hippsley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00570
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion to Continue Case Management Conference is Granted to 6/3/20 at 8:45 a.m. Case Management Conference will be conducted by telephone with the Court initiating the call. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/8/20. (LC,S) (Related Doc #7 )
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to continue Case Management Conference until June 1, 2020 filed by Hadden R. Hippsley, Lambda Tours, Inc. Related document(s) #4 . (Johnson, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Mark C. Johnson filed by on behalf of Hadden R. Hippsley, Lambda Tours, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Hadden R. Hippsley and Lambda Tours Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. Filed on behalf of David Oppenheimer (LeJune, Dana) Modified on 5/6/2020 (S,AN).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 5/13/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/07/20. (D,Ma)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
March 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
March 17, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by David A. Oppenheimer. (LeJune, Dana)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-9862453. Filed by David A. Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Case Information, #2 Exhibit 1 - The Original Work, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #5 Exhibit 4 - September 2018 C&D Letter) (LeJune, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Hippsley, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hippsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadden R Hippsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambda Tours, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadden R. Hippsley
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oppenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Oppenheimer
Represented By: Dana A. LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Dana A. LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?