McPherson v. Cuyahoga County et al
Plaintiff: Alphonso McPherson
Defendant: Peggy Wheeler, CO Ralph Hannum, Ken Mills, Nicholas Cpl. Evans, CO William Wacsey, Dr. Thomas Tallman, Clifford Pinkey, CO Brandon Smith, Cpl. A Brunell, CO Jermaine Clemente, Cpl. Robert Moore, Boster Robert, Cuyahoga County, Timothy Brown, Grace Legreca, Eric Ivey, Cpl. Unknow Corso, CO J. Haden, III, Delmare Beckham, John Doe, 1-5, MetroHealth System and Unknown Kelley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00639
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for extension of Oppose Dispositive Motions until June 12, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Alphonso McPherson. Related document(s) #5 , #4 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Phillips, David)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to #7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal 20cv0627, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal 20cv639, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal State Court, #4 Exhibit Clerk of Court's Order regarding 20cv0627, #5 Exhibit Supplemental Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit MetroHealth Defendant's March 19, 2020 Consent for Removal, #7 Exhibit Service of Parties as of April 14, 2020)(Cappara, Janeane)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for leave to Amend Notice of Removal, Instanter filed by Defendant Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MetroHealth Defendant's March 19, 2020 Consent for Removal, #2 Exhibit MetroHealth Defendant's Answer)(Cappara, Janeane)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Alphonso McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Removal Case No. 1:20 CV 00627, #3 Answer of MetroHealth Systems, Tallman, LeGrega & Wheeler filed in State Court)(Phillips, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for leave to file Motion to Dismiss, Instanter filed by Defendant Cuyahoga County. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave)(Cappara, Janeane)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Partial Motion with Brief in Support for judgment on the pleadings filed by Grace Legreca, MetroHealth System, Thomas Tallman, Peggy Wheeler. (Groedel, Marc)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Cuyahoga County. Related document(s) #1 . (Cappara, Janeane)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
March 26, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
March 26, 2020 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal filed by Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to T. Brown)Related document(s) #1 .(Cappara, Janeane)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 20 930612 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9882968.. Filed by Cuyahoga County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons issued to Clifford Pinkey, #3 Summons issued to Ken Mills, #4 Summons issued to Eric Ivey, #5 Summons issued to John Doe 1, #6 Summons issued to John Doe 2, #7 Summons issued to John Doe 3, #8 Summons issued to William Wacsey, #9 Summons issued to John Doe 4, #10 Summons issued to Nicholas Evans, #11 Summons issued to Cpl. Corso, #12 Summons issued to Cpl. Robert Moore, #13 Summons issued to Sergeant Kelley, #14 Summons issued to A. Brunell, #15 Summons issued to Boster Robert, #16 Summons issued to Delmare Beckham, #17 Summons issued to J. Haden, III, #18 Summons issued to Ralph Hannum, #19 Summons issued to Brandon Smith, #20 Summons issued to Jermaine Clemente, #21 Summons issued to Nurse Grace Lagreca, #22 Summons issued to Nurse Peggy Wheeler, #23 Summons return of service for MetroHealth, #24 Summons return of service for Dr. Thomas Tallman, #25 Summons issued to John Doe 5, #26 Summons return or service for Cuyahoga County, #27 Summons status for all parties as of March 24, 2020, #28 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cappara, Janeane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Cuyahoga County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Wheeler
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Ralph Hannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Cpl. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO William Wacsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas Tallman
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Pinkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Brandon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. A Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Jermaine Clemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Robert Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boster Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County
Represented By: Janeane R. Cappara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Legreca
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Unknow Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO J. Haden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmare Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroHealth System
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso McPherson
Represented By: David G. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?