Levicky v. Option Care Enterprises et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Levicky
Defendant: Adrianne Seese and Option Care Enterprises
Case Number: 1:2020cv00654
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Option Care Enterprises. (Haring, Andrew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First #6 Amended Complaint filed by Option Care Enterprises, Adrianne Seese. (Haring, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 First Amended complaint for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants. Filed by Kelly Levicky. (Rodriguez, Angela)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 5/22/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/07/20. (D,Ma)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Plead is Granted to 4/24/20. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/2/20. (LC,S) re #4
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 24, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Option Care Enterprises, Adrianne Seese. (Haring, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
March 27, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
March 27, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Other Affiliate Option Care Health, Inc. for Option Care Enterprises filed by Option Care Enterprises. (Haring, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Please, case number CV 20 929876 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9887377. Filed by Option Care Enterprises, Adrianne Seese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haring, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levicky v. Option Care Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianne Seese
Represented By: John Gerak
Represented By: Andrew S. Haring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option Care Enterprises
Represented By: John Gerak
Represented By: Andrew S. Haring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Levicky
Represented By: Angela L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?