O'Brien v. Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Brett John O'Brien
Defendant: Department of Defense, US ARMY TRAINING AND DOCTRINE, DEPARTMENT OF ARMY and US ARMY CADET COMMAND
Case Number: 1:2020cv00816
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Department of Defense, Department of the Army, U.S. Army Cadet Command, U.S. Army Training and Doctrine Command. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #7 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until June 11, 2020. (S,KM)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until June 11, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Department of Defense, Department of the Army, U.S. Army Cadet Command, U.S. Army Training and Doctrine Command. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Department of the Army. (L,MI)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement to Summons Issued, - DoA-Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (O'Brien, Katherine)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Department of Defense, U.S. Army Cadet Command, U.S. Army Training and Doctrine Command, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. No summons issued to Department of the Army, and not issued. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons DoD summons, #2 Summons Justin Herdman Summons, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons USACC, #5 Summons USATT, #6 Complaint Signed Complaint)(O'Brien, Katherine)
April 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
April 16, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (O'Brien, Katherine)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief against All Defendants. (Unsigned) Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9922142. Filed by Brett O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-DoD, #3 Summons-DoA, #4 Summons-USAC, #5 Summons-USAT) (O'Brien, Katherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #6 signed complaint) (L,MI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ARMY TRAINING AND DOCTRINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ARMY CADET COMMAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett John O'Brien
Represented By: Katherine North O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?