Holcepl et al v. Pardeep Singh et al
Plaintiff: Danielle A. Holcepl and Ronald Latson
Defendant: Medical Mutual of Ohio, Gill Pardeep Singh, Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services and Longview Logistics, Ltd.
Cross Claimant: State of Ohio, Department of Medicaid
Case Number: 1:2020cv01167
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s) #9 . (B,R)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Related Document #8 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/11/2020. (R,Sh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Form filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. Related document(s) #5 .(Anthony, Carl)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Answer to Cross-Claim of Defendant, State of Ohio Department of Medicaid filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. (Anthony, Carl)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. (Anthony, Carl)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
May 29, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
May 29, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. Related document(s) #1 .(Anthony, Carl)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR. Document blank - refiled as document #4 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. Related document(s) #1 .(Anthony, Carl) Modified on 5/29/2020 (B,R).
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. (Anthony, Carl)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV20931652 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10006559.. Filed by Longview Logistics, Ltd., Gill Pardeep Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Letter to Ms. Friesen, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of filing) (Anthony, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holcepl et al v. Pardeep Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle A. Holcepl
Represented By: David P. Thomas
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Howard E. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Latson
Represented By: David P. Thomas
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Howard E. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Mutual of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Pardeep Singh
Represented By: Carl A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Jobs and Family Services
Represented By: Joseph M. McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longview Logistics, Ltd.
Represented By: Carl A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: State of Ohio, Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Joseph M. McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?