Bozin et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Plaintiff: Nicole Hornbeck, Alexandria Polichena, Bernadette Nolen, Timothy Smith and Daniel Bozin
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01191
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:20-cv-05070, filed 07/02/2020. Related document(s) #21 . (M,TL)
July 1, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Southern District of New York on 7/1/20 (Related document(s) #21 ). (H,SP)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order of Transfer: This Court, having GRANTED Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. #12 ), hereby TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/29/20. (LC,S)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 Joint Stipulation to Transfer of case and plaintiffs' withdrawal of pending Motion for expedited discovery filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Related document(s) #12 , #14 ) (Warren, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by seven days and Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by seven days is GRANTED. #19 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/18/2020.(D,Ma)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 6/26/2020 to file response/reply to #12 Motion to change/transfer venue , #14 Motion for leave conduct limited expedited discovery filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. Related document(s) #12 , #14 . (Dann, Marc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 Letter Regarding Additional Substantially Similar Class Action Complaints filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. Related document(s) #12 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint - Neal v. Deloitte (No. 20-cv-04362), #2 Exhibit B - Complaint - Julius v. Deloitte (No. 20-cv-542), #3 Exhibit C - C - Neal v. Deloitte -Statement of Relatedness)(Warren, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order: This matter is before the Court upon a number of motions. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. #11 ) for a period of 30 days. The Court further GRANTS the Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery (Doc. #15 ). In addition, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Briefs in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. #12 ), as well as Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery (Doc. #14 ), are due on June 19, 2020; and Reply briefs are due June 26, 2020. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/9/20. (LC,S)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to withdraw document #13 Motion to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. Related document(s) #13 . (Flick, Brian)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 Motion for leave conduct limited expedited discover filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - request to produce, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Newland declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Dann, Marc)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for leave conduct limited expedited discovery filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - requests to produce, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Newland Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Flick, Brian)s/ by Marc Dann. Modified text on 6/8/2020 (S,SR).
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to change/transfer venue filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, Culbertson Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Burns Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, Alexander Complaint, #5 Exhibit D, Malm Declaration)(Warren, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time to answer #1 #4 filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Warren, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again.. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/5/20. (Related Doc #8 ) (LC,S) Modified on 6/8/2020 to correct text (LC,S).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alvin Y. Lee is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again.. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/5/20. (Related Doc #7 ) (LC,S)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth Adler is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again.. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/5/20. (Related Doc #6 ) (LC,S)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Phyllis B. Sumner is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again.. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/5/20. (Related Doc #5 )(LC,S)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 65 for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/4/20. (LC,S) (Related Doc #4 )
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to #4 Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and/or Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Malm)(Warren, Daniel)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10018759, filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. and Certificate of Good Standing attached hereto, #2 Proposed Order)(Dann, Marc)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Alvin Y. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016931, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alvin Lee, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Elizabeth D. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016930, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth D. Adler, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Phyllis B. Sumner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016928, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Phyllis B. Sumner, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and/or Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Flick Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Entry) (Dann, Marc). Added Motion for preliminary injunction on 6/3/2020 (H,SP).
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
June 1, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
June 1, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Deloitte LLP for Deloitte Consulting LLP filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Warren, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-932778 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10010377.. Filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Shoupp Decl.) (Warren, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bozin et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Represented By: Phyllis B. Sumner
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Adler
Represented By: Lisa M. Ghannoum
Represented By: Alvin Y. Lee
Represented By: Dante A. Marinucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hornbeck
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Polichena
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Nolen
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Smith
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bozin
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?