PFG Ventures, LP v. Streich
Plaintiff: PFG Ventures, LP dba Proforma, Inc.
Defendant: Steven Streich
Case Number: 1:2020cv01274
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of Dismissal. Plaintiff has a Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (ECF #8 ) The Defendant has filed a response stating that he consents to dismissal without prejudice. (ECF #9 ) Therefore, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/24/2020. re #8 , #9 , #11 . (M,S)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to dismiss without prejudice (Related Doc #8 ) with consent of Defendant. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/24/2020. (M,S)
July 23, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Case Management Conference continued to 7/29/2020 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (M,S)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Case Management Report filed by Steven Streich. Related document #8
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Consent to #8 Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Steven Streich. (Lopez, Louis)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff PFG Ventures, LP. (Schechter, Roy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/27/2020 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/1/2020. (M,S)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certified copy of state court documents received from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (J,G)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Louis D. Lopez for Steven Streich. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/12/2020. (M,S)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Louis D. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. as Co-Counsel for Defendant Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10036681, filed by Defendant Steven Streich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Louis D. Lopez, Esq.)(Jones, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
June 11, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
June 11, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Steven Streich. (Jones, Melissa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 20 932096 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10033838.. Filed by Steven Streich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PFG Ventures, LP v. Streich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Streich
Represented By: Melissa A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFG Ventures, LP dba Proforma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?