Mays v. Mays
Petitioner: Clifton B. Mays
Respondent: Warden Harold Mays
Case Number: 1:2020cv01402
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2020-18. In the event of a referral this case will be referred to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Modified docket text. (M,R)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for default judgment filed by Petitioner Clifton B. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1 - Motion for New Appellate Counsel, #2 Exhibit C - Challenge/Objection of the continuance on 6/7/2018, #3 Exhibit C-2 - C-3 - Motion to discharge for falsification of complaint, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope)(L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Motion Order to compel filed by Petitioner Clifton B. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Criminal/Civil Complaint filed by Clifton B. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for arrest judgment; Case 18-cr-627206-A, #2 Exhibit B1 - Complaint; Case 18-cr-627206-A, #3 Affidavit of Bias and Prejudice, #4 Motion for Legal Interrogatory; Case 18-cr-627206-A, #5 Envelope) (H,SP)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), filed by Clifton B. Mays. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(J,FE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Show Cause filed by Petitioner Clifton B. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Evidence in Support)(Y,A)
June 25, 2020 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Clifton Mays at P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 6/25/2020. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Y,A)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
June 25, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
June 25, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Clifton B. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- Demand for Grand Jury Testimony, #4 Disciplinary Documents, #5 Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas Documents, #6 Eighth District Court of Appeals Journal Entries) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifton B. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?