Richey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shannon Richey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01558
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney on 7/28/2020, by Federal Express on U.S. Attorney General on 7/30/2020, by Federal Express on Commissioner of Social Security on 7/30/2020, filed on behalf of Shannon Richey. Related document(s) #8 . (L,MI)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal on 7/24/2020 for service upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security. (S,S)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/24/2020. (S,S)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/24/2020. (S,S)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (L,MI)
July 15, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2020. (L,MI)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
July 15, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
July 15, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Shannon Richey. (Braun, Katherine)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Shannon Richey. (Braun, Katherine)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Shannon Richey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Richey
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?