Isaac v. Zarlenga et al
Plaintiff: Ashraf O. Isaac
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf, Karyn Zarlenga and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv01566
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Opinion and Order remanding case to the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/18/20. (P,R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Status Report Regarding Plaintiff's Naturalization Application filed by All Defendants. (Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Defendants are to file a written report as to the status of Plaintiff's naturalization application no later than August 17, 2020. (Related document #1 ). Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/20/2020. (K,K)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf, Karyn Zarlenga, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
July 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
July 16, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ashraf O Isaac. (Wong, Margaret)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application and Request for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10109730. Filed by Ashraf O. Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Karyn Zarlenga, #3 Summons - Kenneth Cuccinelli, #4 Summons - Chad Wolf, #5 Summons - William Barr, #6 Summons - Justin Herdman, #7 Exhibit A- N-400 receipt notice and fingerprint notice, #8 Exhibit B-Status inquiry response) (Wong, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Zarlenga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn Zarlenga
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashraf O. Isaac
Represented By: Margaret W. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?