Lyons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Charisse Lyons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01567
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 7/27/2020; by FedEx upon the US Attorney General on 7/29/2020; by FedEx upon the Social Security Administration on 7/29/2020 (unsigned marked C-19) filed on behalf of Charisse Lyons Related document(s) #5 . (J,FE)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security (c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA)
July 16, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/16/2020. (B,R)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
July 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
July 16, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Providing Information to US Attorney filed by Charisse Lyons. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Charisse Lyons. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Charisse Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM-285 Attorney General, #3 USM-285 US Attorney, #4 USM-285 Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney, #7 Summons Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisse Lyons
Represented By: Clifford M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?