Scandling v. United States Department of Labor
Plaintiff: Jonathan Scandling
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 1:2020cv01585
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by United States Department of Labor. (DeCaro, Sara)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Joint Notice of Appearance by Sara E. DeCaro and Lisa Hammond Johnson filed by on behalf of United States Department of Labor. Related document(s) #1 .(DeCaro, Sara)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Justin Herdman, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio on 7/23/2020 filed on behalf of Jonathan Scandling. Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
July 21, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States Department of Labor Receipt # 70100780000177934455, U.S. Attorney General Receipt # 70100780000177934448 and the U.S. Attorney Receipt # 70100780000178272495 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,SR)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney General, United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
July 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
July 20, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against United States Department of Labor. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10114096.. Filed by Jonathan Scandling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email dated 12-18-2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email dated 12-19-2019, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email dated 1-28-2020, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email dated 2-10-2020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email dated 2-10-2020, #6 Summons U.S. Dept of Labor, #7 Summons U.S. Atty General, #8 Summons Atty for OHND, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bumpass, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scandling v. United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Scandling
Represented By: T. Merritt Bumpass, Jr.
Represented By: Carl H. Gluek
Represented By: Ryan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Sara E. DeCaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?