Moore v. Mid-West Forge Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Moore
Defendant: David Elersich and Mid-West Forge Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01628
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. On September 9, 2020, the Court held a teleconference attended by Plaintiff's counsel Andrew Pappert; Plaintiff Joseph Moore; Defendants' counsel James Drozdowski; and Defendants' representatives Joan Simone and Irene Conklin. Defendant David Elersich was not present as he is no longer with the company. The Court discussed the status of the case with the parties and assisted with mediating a settlement agreement. The Court instructed the parties to continue settlement discussions and scheduled a follow-up teleconference for September 21, 2020, at 11:30 am. Clients and counsel are required to attend, and dial-in instructions will be provided to all parties. The parties are to notify the Court if a settlement agreement is reached prior to the teleconferenceTime: 30 min. (P,R)
August 19, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. On August 19, 2020, the Court held a telephonic case management conference attended by Plaintiff Joseph Moore, Plaintiff's counsel Andrew D. Pappert, Defendant David Elersich, Defendant Mid-West Forge Corp.'s representatives Irene Conklin and Kwisun Rogers, and Defendants' counsel James M. Drozdowski. The Court encouraged the parties to begin settlement negotiations and scheduled a follow-up teleconference for September 9, 2020 at 10:00AM. Clients and counsel are required to attend and are to use the same dial-in instructions.Time: 15 min. (P,R)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by David Elersich, Mid-West Forge Corp.. (Drozdowski, James)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to continue Case Management Conference (Related Doc #10 ). The Case Management Conference is continued to 8/19/2020 at 10:30 AM at to be held telephonically before Judge Dan Aaron Polster Report of Parties' Planning Meeting now due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 8/17/2020. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/6/2020.(K,K)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Motion to continue Case Management Conference until 8/19/2020, at 10:30 a.m., filed by David Elersich, Mid-West Forge Corp. (Drozdowski, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures filed by David Elersich, Mid-West Forge Corp. (Drozdowski, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Joseph Moore. (Pappert, Andrew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures filed by Joseph Moore. (Pappert, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of State Court Documents Received From Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number CV-20-933596. (J,G)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/10/2020 at 01:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Call in instructions to be provided separately. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/24/2020. (K,K)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mid-West Forge Corp.(Drozdowski, James)
July 23, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Mid-West Forge Corp. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by David Elersich, Mid-West Forge Corp.. (Drozdowski, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
July 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
July 23, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-933596 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10125455. Filed by David Elersich, Mid-West Forge Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings) (Drozdowski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Mid-West Forge Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Elersich
Represented By: James M. Drozdowski
Represented By: Nancy A. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-West Forge Corp.
Represented By: James M. Drozdowski
Represented By: Nancy A. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moore
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Andrew D. Pappert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?