Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO et al v. Ashtabula County Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO, REBEKAH SPENCER and STEPHANIE HALL
Defendant: VERNON PALO, PEG CARLO, SATHISH ADIGOPULA, MD, RICHARD PARKER, MD, BILL DINGLEDINE, Ashtabula County Medical Center, MARLENE SARTINI, JOE GIANGOLA, ALEXANDER TAICH, MD, KATHERINE HANCOCK, JASON HERGENROEDER, NANCY KISTER, ROGER CORLETT, DAVID PONTIUS, MICHAEL HABOWSKI, CRAIG SERNIK, Rev. Vernon Palo and Jim Timonere
Case Number: 1:2020cv01656
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 32 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Nancy Kister. Service attempted by certified mail on 9/2/20 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 Marginal Order approving #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/20/2020. (J,G)
August 11, 2020 Filing 30 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Vernon Palo on 8/8/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 10, 2020 Filing 29 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sathish Adigopula, MD on 8/4/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 10, 2020 Filing 28 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Katherine Hancock on 8/6/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michael Habowski on 8/3/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 6, 2020 Filing 26 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Alexander Taich, MD on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Petroff, D.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 24 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Craig Sernik on 8/3/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, (signed Covid19) filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 23 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Roger Corlett on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 22 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Peg Carlo on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jason Hergenroeder on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon David Pontius on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Bill Dingledine on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ashtabula County Medical Center on 8/3/2020, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Karen Soehnlen McQueen filed by on behalf of Ashtabula County Medical Center. (McQueen, Karen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 Opinion and Order. The Court finds that at this stage of the proceedings Plaintiffs have failed to meet their burden to show by clear and convincing evidence that they will suffer irreparable harm when ACMC closes its Maternity Ward on August 1, 2020, therefore, the Court denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Related Doc #2 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/31/2020. (J,G)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 Supplement to Motion for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief - Third Declaration of Chris Eisengart, RN, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (Petroff, D.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 Supplement to Brief - Supplemental Affidavit of Jacquie DiFiore, filed by Ashtabula County Medical Center. Related document(s) #10 . (Kelly, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Supplement to Motion for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief - Declaration of Jill Koski, RN, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (Petroff, D.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 Supplement to Motion for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief - Declaration of Janna Nelson, RN, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (Petroff, D.)
July 31, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone status conference held 07/29/2020. Parties agree grievances are proceeding in accordance with the CBA grievance procedure. Defendant to file their Opposition Brief by 07/30/2020. (Court Reporter: n/a)Time: 30 minutes. (J,G)
July 31, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sathish Adigopula, MD, receipt #70181830000228089779, Ashtabula County Medical Center, receipt #70181830000228089762 Peg Carlo, receipt #70181830000228089786, Roger Corlett, receipt #70181830000228089793, Bill Dingledine, receipt #70181830000228089809, Joe Giangola, receipt #70181830000228089816, Michael Habowski, receipt #70181830000228089823, Katherine Hancock, receipt #70181830000228089830, Jason Hergenroeder, receipt # 70181830000228089847, Nancy Kister, receipt #70181830000228029854. Vernon Palo, receipt #70181830000228089861, Richard Parker, MD, receipt #70181830000228089878, David Pontius, receipt #70181830000228089885, Marlene Sartini, receipt #70181830000228089892, Craig Sernik, receipt #70181830000228089908, Alexander Taich, MD, receipt #70181830000228089915, Jim Timonere, receipt #70181830000228089922 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Jacquelyn Difiore filed by Ashtabula County Medical Center. Related document(s) #10 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Habowski)(Kelly, Brian)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ashtabula County Medical Center. Related Document(s): #2 . (Kelly, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Supplement to Motion for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief - Second Declaration of Christine Eisengart, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Anne Mueller)(Petroff, D.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Revised Certificate of Service of Motion for Injunctive Relief, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Corresponding Memorandum of Support with Declaration of Anne Mueller and Declaration of Sarah Ingles Attached filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 .(Petroff, D.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Smith as Counsel for Defendants filed by on behalf of Ashtabula County Medical Center. (Smith, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Frantz, Sr as Counsel for Defendants filed by on behalf of Ashtabula County Medical Center. (Frantz, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Brian J. Kelly as Counsel for Defendant filed by on behalf of Ashtabula County Medical Center. (Kelly, Brian)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Sathish Adigopula, MD, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Peg Carlo, Roger Corlett, Bill Dingledine, Joe Giangola, Michael Habowski, Katherine Hancock, Jason Hergenroeder, Nancy Kister, Vernon Palo, Richard Parker, MD, David Pontius, Marlene Sartini, Craig Sernik, Alexander Taich, MD, Jim Timonere. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte Attorney Certification (motion) for Emergency Temporary Injunctive Relief filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (Petroff, D.)
July 28, 2020 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (B,R)
July 28, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief filed by Stephanie Hall, Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO, Rebekah Spencer. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Affidavit of Tiffany Bukoffsky, #4 Exhibit 1 - Tiffany Bukoffsky Resume, #5 Exhibit 2 - 2013 ACMC Community Health Needs Assessment, #6 Exhibit 3 - Maternity License Search for Ashtabula County, #7 Exhibit 4 - Nowhere to Go Maternity Care Deserts Across the US, #8 Exhibit 5 - Association Between Loss of Hospital-Based Obstetric Services and Birth Outcomes in Rural Counties, #9 Exhibit 6 - Rural-Urban Difference in Access to Hospital Obstetric and Neonatal Care, #10 Exhibit 7- 2018 Ohio Infant Mortality Annual Report, #11 Exhibit 8 - Why Are Obstetric Units in Rural Hospitals Closing Their Doors, #12 Exhibit 9 - Maternal Health Care in Rural Communities, #13 Exhibit 10 - Maternal Health Care in Rural Communities, #14 Exhibit 11 - Health Policy Institute of Ohio 2019 Health Value Dashboard, #15 Exhibit 12 - Ashtabula County Ohio County Health Rankings, #16 Exhibit 13 - ACMC Obstetrical Unit PowerPoint, #17 Exhibit 14 - The Rural Maternity Care Crisis, #18 Exhibit 15 - Ohio 2017-19 State Health Improvement Plan, #19 Exhibit 16 - SDOIM Snapshot, #20 Affidavit of Chris Eisengart, #21 Proposed Order)(Petroff, D.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10133001. Filed by Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO, Rebekah Spencer, Stephanie Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Sathish Adigopula, MD, #3 Summons for Bill Dingledine, #4 Summons for Katherine Hancock, #5 Summons for Jason Hergenroeder, #6 Summons for Richard Parker, MD., #7 Summons for Marlene Sartini, #8 Summons for Alexander Taich, MD, #9 Summons for Jim Timonere, #10 Summons for Ashtabula County Medical Center, #11 Summons for Peg Carlo, #12 Summons for Roger Corlett, #13 Summons for Michael Habowski, #14 Summons for Nancy Kister, #15 Summons for Rev. Vernon Palo, #16 Summons for David Pontius, #17 Summons for Craig Sernik, #18 Summons for Joe Giangola, #19 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rebekah Spenser, #20 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Stephanie Hall, #21 Exhibit 3 - ONA CBA, #22 Exhibit 4 - ONA Ashtabula OB Unit Group Grievance) (Petroff, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO et al v. Ashtabula County Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERNON PALO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEG CARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATHISH ADIGOPULA, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PARKER, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL DINGLEDINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashtabula County Medical Center
Represented By: Michael E. Smith
Represented By: Brian J. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Frantz, Sr.
Represented By: Karen Soehnlen McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARLENE SARTINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE GIANGOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER TAICH, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE HANCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HERGENROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY KISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER CORLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PONTIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HABOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG SERNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev. Vernon Palo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Timonere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Nurses Association/AFT, AFL-CIO
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Sarah E. Ingles
Represented By: Jonathan C. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBEKAH SPENCER
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Sarah E. Ingles
Represented By: Jonathan C. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HALL
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Sarah E. Ingles
Represented By: Jonathan C. Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?