Pate v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kimberly Pate
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01778
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail upon Commissioner of Social Security filed on behalf of Kimberly Pate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipt, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Braun, Katherine)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney General via certified mail on 8/20/2020 and c/o Regional Chief Counsel via certified mail on 8/18/20 (no signature) filed on behalf of Kimberly Pate. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Braun, Katherine) Modified text n 9/22/2020 (M,TL).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR)
August 12, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 8/12/2020. (L,MI)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Atty General, Office of the Regional Chief. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
August 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (L,MI)
August 12, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Compliance filed by Kimberly Pate. (Braun, Katherine)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10176822. Filed by Kimberly Pate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pate v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Pate
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?