Beniamen et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Youanna Beniamen, Sameh Beniamen and Hanan Beniamen
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc., JOHN DOES (1-100), Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Marc Glassman, Inc. doing business as Marc's Store & Pharmacy
Case Number: 1:2020cv01793
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 Opposition to #15 Motion to dismiss for fraudulent joinder filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Beniamen Complaint)(Acton, Shawn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent.Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2020. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 3/2/2021. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 25 minutes. (M,S)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alissa C. Wetzel for Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #17 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/7/2020. (M,S)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Caryl, Christopher)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Alissa C. Wetzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10320577, filed by Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Dirisamer, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 Opposition to #9 Motion to remand to State Court and Memorandum in Support pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holder, Sarena)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to dismiss for fraudulent joinder filed by Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder)(Dirisamer, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Marc Glassman, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by David J. Dirisamer filed by on behalf of Marc Glassman, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by David J. Dirisamer filed by on behalf of Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/9/2020. (M,S)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to remand to State Court and Memorandum in Support pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Hanan Beniamen, Sameh Beniamen, Youanna Beniamen. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint filed in State Court)(Acton, Shawn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order denying Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/25/2020. (M,S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Staying Case in Kay Waterhouse (Estate) v. Johnson & Johnson, #2 Exhibit B-Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Holder, Sarena s/by Christopher J. Caryl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Holder, Sarena s/Christopher J. Caryl)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/13/2020. (R,Sh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Holder, Sarena)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Holder, Sarena)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
August 13, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
August 13, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 13, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
August 13, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (Y,A)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-20-934616 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10179527. Filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Lacey Elberg, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Christopher Caryl, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Rosa Son, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Caryl, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beniamen et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Glassman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Represented By: Alissa C. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Glassman, Inc. doing business as Marc's Store & Pharmacy
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Represented By: Alissa C. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youanna Beniamen
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sameh Beniamen
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanan Beniamen
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?