Howard v. Graphic Packaging International LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Howard
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC and Graphic Packaging International
Case Number: 1:2020cv01801
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/3/2020 at 02:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Pamela A. Barker. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(L,Ja)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy. (L,Ja)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Graphic Packaging International. (Smith, James)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: This matter was removed to this Court on August 13, 2020. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than August 31, 2020, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/17/2020. (L,Ja)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 21, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Othewise Plead. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/17/2020.(L,Ja)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 21, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Othewise Plead filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International. (Smith, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
August 14, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
August 14, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent International Paper Company, Corporate Parent Graphic Packaging Holding Company, Corporate Parent Graphic Packaging International Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent GPI Holding III, LLC for Graphic Packaging International LLC filed by Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Orr, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 20 934860 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-10182866. Filed by Graphic Packaging International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer B. Orr, with State Court Complaint, Docket Sheet, and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of E. Jewelle Johnson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Scott Slocum, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orr, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Graphic Packaging International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Howard
Represented By: Dennis R. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC
Represented By: Jennifer B. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International
Represented By: Jennifer B. Orr
Represented By: James P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?