Burrell v. City of East Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: Martaze Burrell
Defendant: Michael Cardilli, Kenneth Lundy, Joseph David Marche, Travis Kesecker, Larry McDonald, City of East Cleveland, Phillip Howell, Kenneth Desalvo Lundy, Kenneth Desalvo Scott, Joseph Marche and Kenneth Desalvo Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01823
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Brief in Opposition to #4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Martaze Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript From 8/22/2019, #2 Exhibit Hearing Transcript From 11/18/2019, #3 Exhibit Hearing Transcript From 6/24/2020)(McNeal, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Michael Cardilli, City of East Cleveland, Phillip Howell, Travis Kesecker, Kenneth Desalvo Lundy, Joseph Marche, Larry McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2018 Agency Roster, #2 Exhibit 2018 Audit Letter, #3 Exhibit Police Report, #4 Exhibit Officer Basic Training Letter, #5 Exhibit Desk Duty Order, #6 Exhibit Crenshaw Public Records Request, #7 Exhibit SD 18-077854 Complaint, #8 Exhibit SD 18-077857 Complaint, #9 Exhibit SD 18- 077858 Complaint, #10 Exhibit Judge McMonagle Disqualification Letter, #11 Exhibit Hemmon s Disciplinary Letter, #12 Exhibit Crenshaw Request to Refer City Attorneys for Disclipline, #13 Exhibit Crenshaw Complaint for Permanent Injunction, #14 Exhibit Burrell Juvi Bindover JE, #15 Exhibit Crenshaw Joinder to Vexatious Suit Request)(McCollough, Heather)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Removal Statement Corrected Notice of Removal filed by Michael Cardilli, City of East Cleveland, Phillip Howell, Travis Kesecker, Kenneth Lundy, Joseph David Marche, Larry McDonald. Related document(s) #1 . (Hemmons, Willa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 20-935461 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10190142. Filed by Michael Cardilli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Notice of Service, #4 Summons) (Hemmons, Willa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell v. City of East Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cardilli
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lundy
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph David Marche
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kesecker
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry McDonald
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of East Cleveland
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Howell
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Desalvo Lundy
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Desalvo Scott
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Marche
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Desalvo Johnson
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Represented By: Heather C. McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martaze Burrell
Represented By: Christopher McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?