Carroll v. Hill, et al.
Plaintiff: Kim Arlene Carroll
Defendant: Eva Arlene Hill, Geauga County Park District, Eva Arlene Barber, William A. Barber, Michelle Barber and William D. Barber
Case Number: 1:2020cv01833
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/9/2020 granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Michelle Barber, William A. Barber, William D. Barber, Eva Arlene Hill answer due 10/29/2020.. Judge James S. Gwin on 10/9/2020.(S,KM)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 29, 2020 to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michelle Barber, William A. Barber, William D. Barber, Eva Arlene Hill. Related document(s) #1 . (Wallace, David)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Geauga County Park District. (Hicks, Todd)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Todd C. Hicks filed by on behalf of Geauga County Park District. (Hicks, Todd)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon William D. Barber on 9/14/2020 (signed c-19), filed on behalf of Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Geauga County Park District on 8/31/2020, filed on behalf of Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon William A. Barber on 9/2/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Michelle Barber on 9/2/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Eva Arlene Hill on 9/2/2020, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Michelle Barber, William A. Barber, William D. Barber, Geauga County Park District, Eva Arlene Hill. (W,CM)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Kim Arlene Carroll. (Sharma, Aanchal)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Supplement to the Complaint, Summons filed by Kim Arlene Carroll. Related document(s) #1 . (Sharma, Aanchal)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10193059. Filed by Kim Arlene Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Live Birth, #3 Exhibit 2 - Brentwood Hospital Birth Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Application for Authority to Administer Estate, #5 Exhibit 4 - Form 1.0, Surviving Spouse, Next of Kin and Legatees and Devisees, #6 Exhibit 5 - Application to Probate Lost Will, #7 Exhibit 6 - Unsigned Will of Albert, #8 Exhibit 7 - October 6, 2000 Judgment Entry admitting lost will, #9 Exhibit 8 - Form 6.1, Schedule of Assets, #10 Exhibit 9 - Geauga County REALlink summaries, #11 Exhibit 10 - Application for Appointment of Guardian of Alleged Incompetent, #12 Exhibit 11 - Judgment Entry appointing Philip G. King as Temporary Emergency Guardian, #13 Exhibit 12 - July 25, 2018 Emergency Motion for Appointment of Physician to Complete Statement, #14 Exhibit 13 - November 6, 2018 Judgment Entry Appointment of Guardian for Incompetent Person, #15 Exhibit 14 - Letters of Guardianship, #16 Exhibit 15 - October 4, 1991 judgment entry in the Past Litigation, #17 Exhibit 16 - November 25, 1991 Certificate of Judgment Lien, #18 Exhibit 17 - November 18, 1991 Judgment Entry, #19 Exhibit 18 - August 29, 1977 Geauga County Certificate of Transfer, #20 Exhibit 19 - legal description for the 1.68 acres included in Parcel Number 12-706213) (Sharma, Aanchal)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Hill, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Arlene Hill
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geauga County Park District
Represented By: Todd C. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Arlene Barber
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Barber
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Barber
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Barber
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Arlene Carroll
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Represented By: Mark M. Mikhaiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?