Lumpkin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia Kaye Lumpkin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01849
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by Certified Mail Return Receipt executed upon US Attorney General on 08/27/2020 filed on behalf of Patricia Kaye Lumpkin Related document(s) #3 . (Shifrin, Debra)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by Certified Mail Return Receipt executed upon Office of Regional Counsel on 09/03/2020 filed on behalf of Patricia Kaye Lumpkin Related document(s) #3 . (Shifrin, Debra)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by Certified Mail Return Receipt executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney on 9/8/2020 (no date on green card, signature marked Covid-19) filed on behalf of Patricia Kaye Lumpkin Related document(s) #3 . (Shifrin, Debra)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrates Judges Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/28/2020. (W,K)
August 19, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/19/2020. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region V. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Patricia Kaye Lumpkin. Related document(s) #1 .(Shifrin, Debra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10197944. Filed by Patricia Kaye Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Shifrin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumpkin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kaye Lumpkin
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?