Stewart v. Giant Eagle, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tommy R. Stewart
Defendant: Security Hut, Inc., Joseph Ferenczy, Giant Eagle, Inc. and Giant Eagle
Case Number: 1:2020cv01852
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tommy R. Stewart. Giant Eagle, Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 filed on behalf of Tommy R. Stewart (Bernard, Dale)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Security Hut, Inc.(44107) and Security Hut, Inc. (44113). (J,G)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Tommy R. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Summons Defendant Security Hut, Inc., #2 Summons Statutory Agent of Defendant Security Hut, Inc.)(Bernard, Dale)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Entry of Appearance by L. Bryan Carr filed by on behalf of Joseph Ferenczy. (Carr, L.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Tommy R. Stewart. Joseph Ferenczy waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 filed on behalf of Tommy R. Stewart (Bernard, Dale)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Joseph Ferenczy, Giant Eagle, Inc., Security Hut, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10199181.. Filed by Tommy R. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"--OCRC Charges, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bernard, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Giant Eagle, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ferenczy
Represented By: L. Bryan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy R. Stewart
Represented By: Dale A. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?