Young-Roach v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brandi Young-Roach
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01853
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. Related document(s) #9 . (M,R)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/9/2020. Related Document(s) #8 . (JLG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Social Security Administration. (Buck, Lynne)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Social Security Administration on 8/25/2020 (date obtained from USPS website), U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/25/2020 (date obtained from USPS website), and U.S. Attorney General on 8/31/2020 filed on behalf of Brandi Young-Roach (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Braun, Katherine) Modified to include all parties served on 9/8/2020 (S,Ke).
August 22, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/22/2020. (S,S)
August 20, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/20/2020. (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Compliance filed by Brandi Young-Roach. (Braun, Katherine)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10200285.. Filed by Brandi Young-Roach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young-Roach v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Young-Roach
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?