Duncan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Paul Duncan
Case Number: 1:2020cv01882
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Related Doc #11 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/22/2020.(K,K)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss filed by Petitioner Paul Duncan. (Kordic, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,HR)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 & #6 .) Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/5/20.(S,HR)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Paul Duncan. (Kordic, Gregory)
September 23, 2020 Copy of NEF for non-document Order filed 9/23/20 emailed to Attorney Gregory Kordic at kordicbraun@gmail.com and kbraun115@yahoo.com. (S,HR)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. On August 24, 2020, Plaintiff filed his complaint and a #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). On August 27, the undersigned issued an order directing the plaintiff to file an amended IFP motion within 14 days. The time period within which to do so has passed and plaintiff has not filed his amended IFP motion. Additionally, it was observed that plaintiff's attorney was not receiving CM/ECF notifications and, on September 15, he was instructed to update his contact information and sign up for CM/ECF notifications. To date, plaintiff's attorney has not complied with this instruction. Accordingly, on or by September 28, counsel is hereby ORDERED to update his information on the docket and sign up for CM/ECF notifications in this case. The failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action for failing to prosecute. Furthermore, if plaintiff still wishes to proceed IFP, he is to file his amended IFP motion on the docket on or by September 30. The failure to file an amended IFP motion may result in the denial of his motion. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/23/20. (S,HR)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an amended IFP, carefully and accurately completing all sections of the form, so that the Court may have a proper basis upon which to evaluate his request to proceed without prepayment of fees. Plaintiff shall file his amended IFP application within 14 days of the date of this Order. The failure to do so may result in the Court denying his application. (Related document #2 ) Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/27/2020. (P,G)
August 25, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/25/2020. (L,MI)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
August 25, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (L,MI)
August 25, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Paul Duncan. (Kordic, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Paul Duncan. (Kordic, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Paul Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 Pay vs Payable chart, #9 ALJ Decision, #10 Duncan Affidavit, #11 Kordic Affidavit) (Kordic, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Duncan
Represented By: Gregory L. Kordic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?