United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tropiano
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Dominic A. Tropiano
Case Number: 1:2020cv01911
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Support of Motion for Financial Remedies filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Javorksi Declaration) (Hanauer, Benjamin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for damages (Motion for Financial Remedies) filed by Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hanauer, Benjamin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Judgment as to Defendant Dominic A. Tropiano. Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, Section 10(b) of theSecurities Exchange Act of 1934 [15 U.S.C. 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5], as stated herein. Defendantshall pay disgorgement of ill-gotten gains, prejudgment interest thereon, and a civil penalty pursuant to Section 20(d) of the Securities Act [15 U.S.C. 77t(d)] and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act [15 U.S.C. 78u(d)(3)]. The Court shall determine the amounts of the disgorgement and civil penalty upon motion of the SEC. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (R,Sh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for entry of judgment, by consent, of permanent injunction and other relief filed by Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (Hanauer, Benjamin). Modified on 8/27/2020 (R,Sh).
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Christopher H. White filed by on behalf of U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (White, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Dominic A. Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
August 27, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
August 27, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Benjamin J. Hanauer filed by on behalf of U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hanauer, Benjamin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Consent of Defendant Dominic Tropiano filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hanauer, Benjamin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Dominic A. Tropiano. Filing fee exempt. Filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hanauer, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tropiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic A. Tropiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hanauer
Represented By: Charles J. Kerstetter
Represented By: Christopher H. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?