Press, et al. v. BP, PLC., et al.
Plaintiff: James Palmer, Joseph Rothbart, Mary Louise Hahn, Adelia Heflin, Terry LaMore, Richard Siira, Hilary Ware, Larry Burton, Burrel Culp, Susan Taylor, Robyn Siira, Rodney Butler, David Pessel, Robert Cameron, Mary Jane Joyce, David Bridgeman, Dewey Bernu, Michael Weldy, Kenneth Keckler, John McDonald, Michael LaBeau, Leon Bartos, Bruce McCrodden, Noel Bartlett, Bernard Sboray, Raymond Weinert, Jeffrey Conrad, Cynthia Brackett, David Williams, Steven Benz, C Michelle Hall, Robert Zampini, John Christopher Anderson, Dennis DeWilde, Michael Surdy, Robert Virtue, Dennis Shaughnessy, Terra Manton, James Burroughs, Nancy Heinen, Stephen McNally, Humberto Vainieri, James Iacoponi, Daniel Porter, Robert Shockey, Daniel Straitiff, Patricia Mesel, Matthew Fulton, Jean Beaver, Edward Smith, Carol Battershell, Fred Garabaldi, Oliver Shackelford, Peter Bartok, Harrison Bubb, Willie Williams, Frederic Pondo, Kay Morris, Michael Rogers, Doretha Grant, Jonathan Klement, Jeanette Woods Matthews, Richard Sabo, Michael Garrigan, Thad Taylor, Denise Schiff, Cheryl Kovatch, Linda O'Horo, Werner Sicvol, Michael Minor, Wendy Hileman, James Johnson, Robert Zimpfer, Stephen Marshall, Moon Poo Lew, Alan Freund, Ingrid Gwalthney, Terence Obeney, Walter Ginn, Peter Hanley, Evelyn Davis, Stephen Repp, Richard Crabtree, William Currier, Frank Ronald Kapcsos, Karen Newton, Daniel Flint, Richard Crosby, Dennis Jonke, Michael Lombardi, Kent Huey, Eugene Braiden Rex, Barbara Harvey, Jeffrey Foshee, James Rossett, William Matte, Arshad Sheikh, George Gonzales, Richard Rupert, David Arnold, Richard Panek, James Hermiller, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Hower, Judy Hanna, Virginia Rogers, Suzanne Bassett, Lynn Centa, Allyson Madsen, James Foster, Erika Denman, Rick Porter, Carol Emeruwa, Kristina Gillespie, Michael Tarjan, Toby Alfred, Nicole Kantelis, Steven Wright, Steven Swanson, John Adzima, Colin Binns, Vincent Buchtman, Laurie Brixius, Donald Anthony, Donovan Kuenzli, Donald Debrier, Gerard Farkas, Ronald Valus, William Mooney, James Schaefer, David Romberg, Karen Shanahan, DeWanda Smith Soeder, Thomas Young, Bradley Hull, Terrance Schreiner, Walter Jackson, Fred Schaefer, Betty Oves, Wally Kowalski, David Gaetjens, Karen Carr, Jack Maddux, Ralph Rocco, Bobby Scruggs, James Cundey, John Dueker, William Doggett, David Atton, Thomas Bond, George Nelson, Victor Astraitis, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Hunt, Edwin Kuhn, Erskine Cade, Dennis Hruska, James Kantelis, Terry Golden, Susan Scott, Maurice Fauley, Phil Brasse, Terry Bailey, Robert Valantas, James Laubacher, Brian Hitch, Jerry Smith, Donna Meister, Vernell Calhoun, Mark Jablonski, Mark Stiles, Michael Press, Michael Popkin, Anne Ujczo, Linda Adamany, Mary Lyn Herdt, Nancy Carter, Dianne Christensen, Paul Tennet, Alton Clark, Joseph Yurkanian, Richard Wall, Douglas Farris, Kevin Latham, Stephen Cossey, Karen DeAngelis, Susan Caito, Gerald Siira, Robert Dyar, David Bell, Roger Breedlove, Brian Blazina, Karen Buchanan, Gary Christman, Robert Herrin, James Gilroy, Victor Adams, Todd Korb, Thomas Matlock, David Yusko, Kenneth Alfred, Thomas Koch, Timothy Reynolds, William Fitzgibbons, Donald Nyberg, Jay Carstenbrock, Christopher Drysdale, Norma Fink, Thomas Hamilton, Michael Osborne, Willa Robinson, Christopher McKenna, Theodore Stagg, Steven Villas, Irma Webb, Ian Walker, Adrienne Greben, Kevin McCaffrey, Deborah Kalmeyer, Randolph Becker, Courtney Kronk, William Hollis, Clive Richard Maskell, Roger Klein, Kellie Rixse, Barney Dotson, Joe Stamm, David Catchpole, Frederic Wagner, Carmen Slominski, James Walpole, Phillip Vancil, John Denis, Michael Morgan, Sandra Scheman, Paul Fowler, Denise Lewis, Esther Swertloff, Pamela Goetsch, Robert Pietrick, Jean Heflich, Michael Mower, Peter Ward, Jeffrey Brame, James Neuenschwander, Edward Bonk, Ronald Vargo, Richard Lipinski, Robert Schrag, Brenda Hnatiak, Tracey Rossett, Anthony Vaccariello, Wendy Walker, Ruth Hennie, William Lynch, Thomas Standing, William Christensen, Bill Brandt, Doug Campbell, Marion Harris, Keath Headen, John Calobrisi, Michael Todor, Susie Thomas, Earl Robinson, April Paramore, Arthur Bumpus, Mark Goodwin, Lisa Mundy and Holly Hansen
Defendant: BP, PLC and BP Corporation North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02052
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/10/2020 granting in part #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until January 4, 2021. (S,KM)
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 Agreed Motion for extension of time until January 15, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP, PLC. Related document(s) #3 . (Williams, Aaron)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Limited Appearances by Aaron M. Williams and Anthony J. OMalley filed by on behalf of BP, PLC. (Williams, Aaron)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Aaron M. Williams and Anthony O'Malley, Esq. filed by on behalf of BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Williams, Aaron)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/14/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kerry J. Miller for Linda Adamany,Kerry J. Miller for Victor Adams,Kerry J. Miller for John Adzima,Kerry J. Miller for Kenneth Alfred,Kerry J. Miller for Toby Alfred,Kerry J. Miller for John Christopher Anderson,Kerry J. Miller for Donald Anthony,Kerry J. Miller for David Arnold,Kerry J. Miller for Victor Astraitis,Kerry J. Miller for David Atton,Kerry J. Miller for Terry Bailey,Kerry J. Miller for Noel Bartlett,Kerry J. Miller for Peter Bartok,Kerry J. Miller for Leon Bartos,Kerry J. Miller for Suzanne Bassett,Kerry J. Miller for Carol Battershell,Kerry J. Miller for Jean Beaver,Kerry J. Miller for Randolph Becker,Kerry J. Miller for David Bell,Kerry J. Miller for Steven Benz,Kerry J. Miller for Dewey Bernu,Kerry J. Miller for Colin Binns,Kerry J. Miller for Brian Blazina,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Bond,Kerry J. Miller for Edward Bonk,Kerry J. Miller for Cynthia Brackett,Kerry J. Miller for Jeffrey Brame,Kerry J. Miller for Bill Brandt,Kerry J. Miller for Phil Brasse,Kerry J. Miller for Roger Breedlove,Kerry J. Miller for David Bridgeman,Kerry J. Miller for Laurie Brixius,Kerry J. Miller for Harrison Bubb,Kerry J. Miller for Karen Buchanan,Kerry J. Miller for Vincent Buchtman,Kerry J. Miller for Arthur Bumpus,Kerry J. Miller for James Burroughs,Kerry J. Miller for Larry Burton,Kerry J. Miller for Rodney Butler,Kerry J. Miller for Erskine Cade,Kerry J. Miller for Susan Caito,Kerry J. Miller for Vernell Calhoun,Kerry J. Miller for John Calobrisi,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Cameron,Kerry J. Miller for Doug Campbell,Kerry J. Miller for Karen Carr,Kerry J. Miller for Jay Carstenbrock,Kerry J. Miller for Nancy Carter,Kerry J. Miller for David Catchpole,Kerry J. Miller for Lynn Centa,Kerry J. Miller for Dianne Christensen,Kerry J. Miller for William Christensen,Kerry J. Miller for Gary Christman,Kerry J. Miller for Alton Clark,Kerry J. Miller for Jeffrey Conrad,Kerry J. Miller for Stephen Cossey,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Crabtree,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Crosby,Kerry J. Miller for Burrel Culp,Kerry J. Miller for James Cundey,Kerry J. Miller for William Currier,Kerry J. Miller for Evelyn Davis,Kerry J. Miller for Karen DeAngelis,Kerry J. Miller for Dennis DeWilde,Kerry J. Miller for Donald Debrier,Kerry J. Miller for John Denis,Kerry J. Miller for Erika Denman,Kerry J. Miller for William Doggett,Kerry J. Miller for Barney Dotson,Kerry J. Miller for Christopher Drysdale,Kerry J. Miller for John Dueker,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Dyar,Kerry J. Miller for Carol Emeruwa,Kerry J. Miller for Gerard Farkas,Kerry J. Miller for Douglas Farris,Kerry J. Miller for Maurice Fauley,Kerry J. Miller for Norma Fink,Kerry J. Miller for William Fitzgibbons,Kerry J. Miller for Daniel Flint,Kerry J. Miller for Jeffrey Foshee,Kerry J. Miller for James Foster,Kerry J. Miller for Paul Fowler,Kerry J. Miller for Alan Freund,Kerry J. Miller for Matthew Fulton,Kerry J. Miller for David Gaetjens,Kerry J. Miller for Fred Garabaldi,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Garrigan,Kerry J. Miller for Kristina Gillespie,Kerry J. Miller for James Gilroy,Kerry J. Miller for Walter Ginn,Kerry J. Miller for Pamela Goetsch,Kerry J. Miller for Terry Golden,Kerry J. Miller for George Gonzales,Kerry J. Miller for Mark Goodwin,Kerry J. Miller for Doretha Grant,Kerry J. Miller for Adrienne Greben,Kerry J. Miller for Ingrid Gwalthney,Kerry J. Miller for Mary Louise Hahn,Kerry J. Miller for C Michelle Hall,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Hamilton,Kerry J. Miller for Peter Hanley,Kerry J. Miller for Judy Hanna,Kerry J. Miller for Holly Hansen,Kerry J. Miller for Marion Harris,Kerry J. Miller for Hedra Harrison,Kerry J. Miller for Barbara Harvey,Kerry J. Miller for Keath Headen,Kerry J. Miller for Jean Heflich,Kerry J. Miller for Adelia Heflin,Kerry J. Miller for Nancy Heinen,Kerry J. Miller for Ruth Hennie,Kerry J. Miller for Mary Lyn Herdt,Kerry J. Miller for James Hermiller,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Herrin,Kerry J. Miller for Wendy Hileman,Kerry J. Miller for Brian Hitch,Kerry J. Miller for Brenda Hnatiak,Kerry J. Miller for William Hollis,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Hower,Kerry J. Miller for Dennis Hruska,Kerry J. Miller for Kent Huey,Kerry J. Miller for Bradley Hull,Kerry J. Miller for Barbara Hunt,Kerry J. Miller for James Iacoponi,Kerry J. Miller for Mark Jablonski,Kerry J. Miller for Walter Jackson,Kerry J. Miller for James Johnson,Kerry J. Miller for Dennis Jonke,Kerry J. Miller for Mary Jane Joyce,Kerry J. Miller for Deborah Kalmeyer,Kerry J. Miller for James Kantelis,Kerry J. Miller for Nicole Kantelis,Kerry J. Miller for Frank Ronald Kapcsos,Kerry J. Miller for Kenneth Keckler,Kerry J. Miller for Roger Klein,Kerry J. Miller for Jonathan Klement,Kerry J. Miller for Daryl Kleppin,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Koch,Kerry J. Miller for Todd Korb,Kerry J. Miller for Cheryl Kovatch,Kerry J. Miller for Wally Kowalski,Kerry J. Miller for Courtney Kronk,Kerry J. Miller for Donovan Kuenzli,Kerry J. Miller for Edwin Kuhn,Kerry J. Miller for Michael LaBeau,Kerry J. Miller for Terry LaMore,Kerry J. Miller for Kevin Latham,Kerry J. Miller for James Laubacher,Kerry J. Miller for Moon Poo Lew,Kerry J. Miller for Denise Lewis,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Lipinski,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Lombardi,Kerry J. Miller for William Lynch,Kerry J. Miller for Jack Maddux,Kerry J. Miller for Allyson Madsen,Kerry J. Miller for Terra Manton,Kerry J. Miller for Stephen Marshall,Kerry J. Miller for Clive Richard Maskell,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Matlock,Kerry J. Miller for William Matte,Kerry J. Miller for Jeanette Woods Matthews,Kerry J. Miller for Kevin McCaffrey,Kerry J. Miller for Bruce McCrodden,Kerry J. Miller for John McDonald,Kerry J. Miller for Christopher McKenna,Kerry J. Miller for Stephen McNally,Kerry J. Miller for Donna Meister,Kerry J. Miller for Patricia Mesel,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Minor,Kerry J. Miller for William Mooney,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Morgan,Kerry J. Miller for Kay Morris,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Mower,Kerry J. Miller for Lisa Mundy,Kerry J. Miller for George Nelson,Kerry J. Miller for James Neuenschwander,Kerry J. Miller for Karen Newton,Kerry J. Miller for Donald Nyberg,Kerry J. Miller for Linda O'Horo,Kerry J. Miller for Terence Obeney,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Osborne,Kerry J. Miller for Betty Oves,Kerry J. Miller for James Palmer,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Panek,Kerry J. Miller for April Paramore,Kerry J. Miller for David Pessel,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Pietrick,Kerry J. Miller for Frederic Pondo,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Popkin,Kerry J. Miller for Daniel Porter,Kerry J. Miller for Rick Porter,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Press,Kerry J. Miller for Stephen Repp,Kerry J. Miller for Eugene Braiden Rex,Kerry J. Miller for Timothy Reynolds,Kerry J. Miller for Kellie Rixse,Kerry J. Miller for Earl Robinson,Kerry J. Miller for Willa Robinson,Kerry J. Miller for Ralph Rocco,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Rogers,Kerry J. Miller for Virginia Rogers,Kerry J. Miller for David Romberg,Kerry J. Miller for James Rossett,Kerry J. Miller for Tracey Rossett,Kerry J. Miller for Joseph Rothbart,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Rupert,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Sabo,Kerry J. Miller for Bernard Sboray,Kerry J. Miller for Fred Schaefer,Kerry J. Miller for James Schaefer,Kerry J. Miller for Sandra Scheman,Kerry J. Miller for Denise Schiff,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Schrag,Kerry J. Miller for Terrance Schreiner,Kerry J. Miller for Susan Scott,Kerry J. Miller for Bobby Scruggs,Kerry J. Miller for Oliver Shackelford,Kerry J. Miller for Karen Shanahan,Kerry J. Miller for Dennis Shaughnessy,Kerry J. Miller for Arshad Sheikh,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Shockey,Kerry J. Miller for Werner Sicvol,Kerry J. Miller for Gerald Siira,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Siira,Kerry J. Miller for Robyn Siira,Kerry J. Miller for Carmen Slominski,Kerry J. Miller for Edward Smith,Kerry J. Miller for Jerry Smith,Kerry J. Miller for DeWanda Smith Soeder,Kerry J. Miller for Theodore Stagg,Kerry J. Miller for Joe Stamm,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Standing,Kerry J. Miller for Mark Stiles,Kerry J. Miller for Daniel Straitiff,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Surdy,Kerry J. Miller for Steven Swanson,Kerry J. Miller for Esther Swertloff,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Tarjan,Kerry J. Miller for Susan Taylor,Kerry J. Miller for Thad Taylor,Kerry J. Miller for Paul Tennet,Kerry J. Miller for Susie Thomas,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Todor,Kerry J. Miller for Anne Ujczo,Kerry J. Miller for Anthony Vaccariello,Kerry J. Miller for Humberto Vainieri,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Valantas,Kerry J. Miller for Ronald Valus,Kerry J. Miller for Phillip Vancil,Kerry J. Miller for Ronald Vargo,Kerry J. Miller for Steven Villas,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Virtue,Kerry J. Miller for Frederic Wagner,Kerry J. Miller for Ian Walker,Kerry J. Miller for Rebecca Barbee Walker,Kerry J. Miller for Wendy Walker,Kerry J. Miller for Richard Wall,Kerry J. Miller for James Walpole,Kerry J. Miller for Peter Ward,Kerry J. Miller for Hilary Ware,Kerry J. Miller for Irma Webb,Kerry J. Miller for Raymond Weinert,Kerry J. Miller for Michael Weldy,Kerry J. Miller for David Williams,Kerry J. Miller for Willie Williams,Kerry J. Miller for Steven Wright,Kerry J. Miller for Thomas Young,Kerry J. Miller for Joseph Yurkanian,Kerry J. Miller for David Yusko,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Zampini,Kerry J. Miller for Robert Zimpfer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 )(S,KM)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/14/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jason W. Burge for Linda Adamany,Jason W. Burge for Victor Adams,Jason W. Burge for John Adzima,Jason W. Burge for Kenneth Alfred,Jason W. Burge for Toby Alfred,Jason W. Burge for John Christopher Anderson,Jason W. Burge for Donald Anthony,Jason W. Burge for David Arnold,Jason W. Burge for Victor Astraitis,Jason W. Burge for David Atton,Jason W. Burge for Terry Bailey,Jason W. Burge for Noel Bartlett,Jason W. Burge for Peter Bartok,Jason W. Burge for Leon Bartos,Jason W. Burge for Suzanne Bassett,Jason W. Burge for Carol Battershell,Jason W. Burge for Jean Beaver,Jason W. Burge for Randolph Becker,Jason W. Burge for David Bell,Jason W. Burge for Steven Benz,Jason W. Burge for Dewey Bernu,Jason W. Burge for Colin Binns,Jason W. Burge for Brian Blazina,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Bond,Jason W. Burge for Edward Bonk,Jason W. Burge for Cynthia Brackett,Jason W. Burge for Jeffrey Brame,Jason W. Burge for Bill Brandt,Jason W. Burge for Phil Brasse,Jason W. Burge for Roger Breedlove,Jason W. Burge for David Bridgeman,Jason W. Burge for Laurie Brixius,Jason W. Burge for Harrison Bubb,Jason W. Burge for Karen Buchanan,Jason W. Burge for Vincent Buchtman,Jason W. Burge for Arthur Bumpus,Jason W. Burge for James Burroughs,Jason W. Burge for Larry Burton,Jason W. Burge for Rodney Butler,Jason W. Burge for Erskine Cade,Jason W. Burge for Susan Caito,Jason W. Burge for Vernell Calhoun,Jason W. Burge for John Calobrisi,Jason W. Burge for Robert Cameron,Jason W. Burge for Doug Campbell,Jason W. Burge for Karen Carr,Jason W. Burge for Jay Carstenbrock,Jason W. Burge for Nancy Carter,Jason W. Burge for David Catchpole,Jason W. Burge for Lynn Centa,Jason W. Burge for Dianne Christensen,Jason W. Burge for William Christensen,Jason W. Burge for Gary Christman,Jason W. Burge for Alton Clark,Jason W. Burge for Jeffrey Conrad,Jason W. Burge for Stephen Cossey,Jason W. Burge for Richard Crabtree,Jason W. Burge for Richard Crosby,Jason W. Burge for Burrel Culp,Jason W. Burge for James Cundey,Jason W. Burge for William Currier,Jason W. Burge for Evelyn Davis,Jason W. Burge for Karen DeAngelis,Jason W. Burge for Dennis DeWilde,Jason W. Burge for Donald Debrier,Jason W. Burge for John Denis,Jason W. Burge for Erika Denman,Jason W. Burge for William Doggett,Jason W. Burge for Barney Dotson,Jason W. Burge for Christopher Drysdale,Jason W. Burge for John Dueker,Jason W. Burge for Robert Dyar,Jason W. Burge for Carol Emeruwa,Jason W. Burge for Gerard Farkas,Jason W. Burge for Douglas Farris,Jason W. Burge for Maurice Fauley,Jason W. Burge for Norma Fink,Jason W. Burge for William Fitzgibbons,Jason W. Burge for Daniel Flint,Jason W. Burge for Jeffrey Foshee,Jason W. Burge for James Foster,Jason W. Burge for Paul Fowler,Jason W. Burge for Alan Freund,Jason W. Burge for Matthew Fulton,Jason W. Burge for David Gaetjens,Jason W. Burge for Fred Garabaldi,Jason W. Burge for Michael Garrigan,Jason W. Burge for Kristina Gillespie,Jason W. Burge for James Gilroy,Jason W. Burge for Walter Ginn,Jason W. Burge for Pamela Goetsch,Jason W. Burge for Terry Golden,Jason W. Burge for George Gonzales,Jason W. Burge for Mark Goodwin,Jason W. Burge for Doretha Grant,Jason W. Burge for Adrienne Greben,Jason W. Burge for Ingrid Gwalthney,Jason W. Burge for Mary Louise Hahn,Jason W. Burge for C Michelle Hall,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Hamilton,Jason W. Burge for Peter Hanley,Jason W. Burge for Judy Hanna,Jason W. Burge for Holly Hansen,Jason W. Burge for Marion Harris,Jason W. Burge for Hedra Harrison,Jason W. Burge for Barbara Harvey,Jason W. Burge for Keath Headen,Jason W. Burge for Jean Heflich,Jason W. Burge for Adelia Heflin,Jason W. Burge for Nancy Heinen,Jason W. Burge for Ruth Hennie,Jason W. Burge for Mary Lyn Herdt,Jason W. Burge for James Hermiller,Jason W. Burge for Robert Herrin,Jason W. Burge for Wendy Hileman,Jason W. Burge for Brian Hitch,Jason W. Burge for Brenda Hnatiak,Jason W. Burge for William Hollis,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Hower,Jason W. Burge for Dennis Hruska,Jason W. Burge for Kent Huey,Jason W. Burge for Bradley Hull,Jason W. Burge for Barbara Hunt,Jason W. Burge for James Iacoponi,Jason W. Burge for Mark Jablonski,Jason W. Burge for Walter Jackson,Jason W. Burge for James Johnson,Jason W. Burge for Dennis Jonke,Jason W. Burge for Mary Jane Joyce,Jason W. Burge for Deborah Kalmeyer,Jason W. Burge for James Kantelis,Jason W. Burge for Nicole Kantelis,Jason W. Burge for Frank Ronald Kapcsos,Jason W. Burge for Kenneth Keckler,Jason W. Burge for Roger Klein,Jason W. Burge for Jonathan Klement,Jason W. Burge for Daryl Kleppin,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Koch,Jason W. Burge for Todd Korb,Jason W. Burge for Cheryl Kovatch,Jason W. Burge for Wally Kowalski,Jason W. Burge for Courtney Kronk,Jason W. Burge for Donovan Kuenzli,Jason W. Burge for Edwin Kuhn,Jason W. Burge for Michael LaBeau,Jason W. Burge for Terry LaMore,Jason W. Burge for Kevin Latham,Jason W. Burge for James Laubacher,Jason W. Burge for Moon Poo Lew,Jason W. Burge for Denise Lewis,Jason W. Burge for Richard Lipinski,Jason W. Burge for Michael Lombardi,Jason W. Burge for William Lynch,Jason W. Burge for Jack Maddux,Jason W. Burge for Allyson Madsen,Jason W. Burge for Terra Manton,Jason W. Burge for Stephen Marshall,Jason W. Burge for Clive Richard Maskell,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Matlock,Jason W. Burge for William Matte,Jason W. Burge for Jeanette Woods Matthews,Jason W. Burge for Kevin McCaffrey,Jason W. Burge for Bruce McCrodden,Jason W. Burge for John McDonald,Jason W. Burge for Christopher McKenna,Jason W. Burge for Stephen McNally,Jason W. Burge for Donna Meister,Jason W. Burge for Patricia Mesel,Jason W. Burge for Michael Minor,Jason W. Burge for William Mooney,Jason W. Burge for Michael Morgan,Jason W. Burge for Kay Morris,Jason W. Burge for Michael Mower,Jason W. Burge for Lisa Mundy,Jason W. Burge for George Nelson,Jason W. Burge for James Neuenschwander,Jason W. Burge for Karen Newton,Jason W. Burge for Donald Nyberg,Jason W. Burge for Linda O'Horo,Jason W. Burge for Terence Obeney,Jason W. Burge for Michael Osborne,Jason W. Burge for Betty Oves,Jason W. Burge for James Palmer,Jason W. Burge for Richard Panek,Jason W. Burge for April Paramore,Jason W. Burge for David Pessel,Jason W. Burge for Robert Pietrick,Jason W. Burge for Frederic Pondo,Jason W. Burge for Michael Popkin,Jason W. Burge for Daniel Porter,Jason W. Burge for Rick Porter,Jason W. Burge for Michael Press,Jason W. Burge for Stephen Repp,Jason W. Burge for Eugene Braiden Rex,Jason W. Burge for Timothy Reynolds,Jason W. Burge for Kellie Rixse,Jason W. Burge for Earl Robinson,Jason W. Burge for Willa Robinson,Jason W. Burge for Ralph Rocco,Jason W. Burge for Michael Rogers,Jason W. Burge for Virginia Rogers,Jason W. Burge for David Romberg,Jason W. Burge for James Rossett,Jason W. Burge for Tracey Rossett,Jason W. Burge for Joseph Rothbart,Jason W. Burge for Richard Rupert,Jason W. Burge for Richard Sabo,Jason W. Burge for Bernard Sboray,Jason W. Burge for Fred Schaefer,Jason W. Burge for James Schaefer,Jason W. Burge for Sandra Scheman,Jason W. Burge for Denise Schiff,Jason W. Burge for Robert Schrag,Jason W. Burge for Terrance Schreiner,Jason W. Burge for Susan Scott,Jason W. Burge for Bobby Scruggs,Jason W. Burge for Oliver Shackelford,Jason W. Burge for Karen Shanahan,Jason W. Burge for Dennis Shaughnessy,Jason W. Burge for Arshad Sheikh,Jason W. Burge for Robert Shockey,Jason W. Burge for Werner Sicvol,Jason W. Burge for Gerald Siira,Jason W. Burge for Richard Siira,Jason W. Burge for Robyn Siira,Jason W. Burge for Carmen Slominski,Jason W. Burge for Edward Smith,Jason W. Burge for Jerry Smith,Jason W. Burge for DeWanda Smith Soeder,Jason W. Burge for Theodore Stagg,Jason W. Burge for Joe Stamm,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Standing,Jason W. Burge for Mark Stiles,Jason W. Burge for Daniel Straitiff,Jason W. Burge for Michael Surdy,Jason W. Burge for Steven Swanson,Jason W. Burge for Esther Swertloff,Jason W. Burge for Michael Tarjan,Jason W. Burge for Susan Taylor,Jason W. Burge for Thad Taylor,Jason W. Burge for Paul Tennet,Jason W. Burge for Susie Thomas,Jason W. Burge for Michael Todor,Jason W. Burge for Anne Ujczo,Jason W. Burge for Anthony Vaccariello,Jason W. Burge for Humberto Vainieri,Jason W. Burge for Robert Valantas,Jason W. Burge for Ronald Valus,Jason W. Burge for Phillip Vancil,Jason W. Burge for Ronald Vargo,Jason W. Burge for Steven Villas,Jason W. Burge for Robert Virtue,Jason W. Burge for Frederic Wagner,Jason W. Burge for Ian Walker,Jason W. Burge for Rebecca Barbee Walker,Jason W. Burge for Wendy Walker,Jason W. Burge for Richard Wall,Jason W. Burge for James Walpole,Jason W. Burge for Peter Ward,Jason W. Burge for Hilary Ware,Jason W. Burge for Irma Webb,Jason W. Burge for Raymond Weinert,Jason W. Burge for Michael Weldy,Jason W. Burge for David Williams,Jason W. Burge for Willie Williams,Jason W. Burge for Steven Wright,Jason W. Burge for Thomas Young,Jason W. Burge for Joseph Yurkanian,Jason W. Burge for David Yusko,Jason W. Burge for Robert Zampini,Jason W. Burge for Robert Zimpfer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 )(S,KM)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/14/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James R. Swanson for Linda Adamany,James R. Swanson for Victor Adams,James R. Swanson for John Adzima,James R. Swanson for Kenneth Alfred,James R. Swanson for Toby Alfred,James R. Swanson for John Christopher Anderson,James R. Swanson for Donald Anthony,James R. Swanson for David Arnold,James R. Swanson for Victor Astraitis,James R. Swanson for David Atton,James R. Swanson for Terry Bailey,James R. Swanson for Noel Bartlett,James R. Swanson for Peter Bartok,James R. Swanson for Leon Bartos,James R. Swanson for Suzanne Bassett,James R. Swanson for Carol Battershell,James R. Swanson for Jean Beaver,James R. Swanson for Randolph Becker,James R. Swanson for David Bell,James R. Swanson for Steven Benz,James R. Swanson for Dewey Bernu,James R. Swanson for Colin Binns,James R. Swanson for Brian Blazina,James R. Swanson for Thomas Bond,James R. Swanson for Edward Bonk,James R. Swanson for Cynthia Brackett,James R. Swanson for Jeffrey Brame,James R. Swanson for Bill Brandt,James R. Swanson for Phil Brasse,James R. Swanson for Roger Breedlove,James R. Swanson for David Bridgeman,James R. Swanson for Laurie Brixius,James R. Swanson for Harrison Bubb,James R. Swanson for Karen Buchanan,James R. Swanson for Vincent Buchtman,James R. Swanson for Arthur Bumpus,James R. Swanson for James Burroughs,James R. Swanson for Larry Burton,James R. Swanson for Rodney Butler,James R. Swanson for Erskine Cade,James R. Swanson for Susan Caito,James R. Swanson for Vernell Calhoun,James R. Swanson for John Calobrisi,James R. Swanson for Robert Cameron,James R. Swanson for Doug Campbell,James R. Swanson for Karen Carr,James R. Swanson for Jay Carstenbrock,James R. Swanson for Nancy Carter,James R. Swanson for David Catchpole,James R. Swanson for Lynn Centa,James R. Swanson for Dianne Christensen,James R. Swanson for William Christensen,James R. Swanson for Gary Christman,James R. Swanson for Alton Clark,James R. Swanson for Jeffrey Conrad,James R. Swanson for Stephen Cossey,James R. Swanson for Richard Crabtree,James R. Swanson for Richard Crosby,James R. Swanson for Burrel Culp,James R. Swanson for James Cundey,James R. Swanson for William Currier,James R. Swanson for Evelyn Davis,James R. Swanson for Karen DeAngelis,James R. Swanson for Dennis DeWilde,James R. Swanson for Donald Debrier,James R. Swanson for John Denis,James R. Swanson for Erika Denman,James R. Swanson for William Doggett,James R. Swanson for Barney Dotson,James R. Swanson for Christopher Drysdale,James R. Swanson for John Dueker,James R. Swanson for Robert Dyar,James R. Swanson for Carol Emeruwa,James R. Swanson for Gerard Farkas,James R. Swanson for Douglas Farris,James R. Swanson for Maurice Fauley,James R. Swanson for Norma Fink,James R. Swanson for William Fitzgibbons,James R. Swanson for Daniel Flint,James R. Swanson for Jeffrey Foshee,James R. Swanson for James Foster,James R. Swanson for Paul Fowler,James R. Swanson for Alan Freund,James R. Swanson for Matthew Fulton,James R. Swanson for David Gaetjens,James R. Swanson for Fred Garabaldi,James R. Swanson for Michael Garrigan,James R. Swanson for Kristina Gillespie,James R. Swanson for James Gilroy,James R. Swanson for Walter Ginn,James R. Swanson for Pamela Goetsch,James R. Swanson for Terry Golden,James R. Swanson for George Gonzales,James R. Swanson for Mark Goodwin,James R. Swanson for Doretha Grant,James R. Swanson for Adrienne Greben,James R. Swanson for Ingrid Gwalthney,James R. Swanson for Mary Louise Hahn,James R. Swanson for C Michelle Hall,James R. Swanson for Thomas Hamilton,James R. Swanson for Peter Hanley,James R. Swanson for Judy Hanna,James R. Swanson for Holly Hansen,James R. Swanson for Marion Harris,James R. Swanson for Hedra Harrison,James R. Swanson for Barbara Harvey,James R. Swanson for Keath Headen,James R. Swanson for Jean Heflich,James R. Swanson for Adelia Heflin,James R. Swanson for Nancy Heinen,James R. Swanson for Ruth Hennie,James R. Swanson for Mary Lyn Herdt,James R. Swanson for James Hermiller,James R. Swanson for Robert Herrin,James R. Swanson for Wendy Hileman,James R. Swanson for Brian Hitch,James R. Swanson for Brenda Hnatiak,James R. Swanson for William Hollis,James R. Swanson for Thomas Hower,James R. Swanson for Dennis Hruska,James R. Swanson for Kent Huey,James R. Swanson for Bradley Hull,James R. Swanson for Barbara Hunt,James R. Swanson for James Iacoponi,James R. Swanson for Mark Jablonski,James R. Swanson for Walter Jackson,James R. Swanson for James Johnson,James R. Swanson for Dennis Jonke,James R. Swanson for Mary Jane Joyce,James R. Swanson for Deborah Kalmeyer,James R. Swanson for James Kantelis,James R. Swanson for Nicole Kantelis,James R. Swanson for Frank Ronald Kapcsos,James R. Swanson for Kenneth Keckler,James R. Swanson for Roger Klein,James R. Swanson for Jonathan Klement,James R. Swanson for Daryl Kleppin,James R. Swanson for Thomas Koch,James R. Swanson for Todd Korb,James R. Swanson for Cheryl Kovatch,James R. Swanson for Wally Kowalski,James R. Swanson for Courtney Kronk,James R. Swanson for Donovan Kuenzli,James R. Swanson for Edwin Kuhn,James R. Swanson for Michael LaBeau,James R. Swanson for Terry LaMore,James R. Swanson for Kevin Latham,James R. Swanson for James Laubacher,James R. Swanson for Moon Poo Lew,James R. Swanson for Denise Lewis,James R. Swanson for Richard Lipinski,James R. Swanson for Michael Lombardi,James R. Swanson for William Lynch,James R. Swanson for Jack Maddux,James R. Swanson for Allyson Madsen,James R. Swanson for Terra Manton,James R. Swanson for Stephen Marshall,James R. Swanson for Clive Richard Maskell,James R. Swanson for Thomas Matlock,James R. Swanson for William Matte,James R. Swanson for Jeanette Woods Matthews,James R. Swanson for Kevin McCaffrey,James R. Swanson for Bruce McCrodden,James R. Swanson for John McDonald,James R. Swanson for Christopher McKenna,James R. Swanson for Stephen McNally,James R. Swanson for Donna Meister,James R. Swanson for Patricia Mesel,James R. Swanson for Michael Minor,James R. Swanson for William Mooney,James R. Swanson for Michael Morgan,James R. Swanson for Kay Morris,James R. Swanson for Michael Mower,James R. Swanson for Lisa Mundy,James R. Swanson for George Nelson,James R. Swanson for James Neuenschwander,James R. Swanson for Karen Newton,James R. Swanson for Donald Nyberg,James R. Swanson for Linda O'Horo,James R. Swanson for Terence Obeney,James R. Swanson for Michael Osborne,James R. Swanson for Betty Oves,James R. Swanson for James Palmer,James R. Swanson for Richard Panek,James R. Swanson for April Paramore,James R. Swanson for David Pessel,James R. Swanson for Robert Pietrick,James R. Swanson for Frederic Pondo,James R. Swanson for Michael Popkin,James R. Swanson for Daniel Porter,James R. Swanson for Rick Porter,James R. Swanson for Michael Press,James R. Swanson for Stephen Repp,James R. Swanson for Eugene Braiden Rex,James R. Swanson for Timothy Reynolds,James R. Swanson for Kellie Rixse,James R. Swanson for Earl Robinson,James R. Swanson for Willa Robinson,James R. Swanson for Ralph Rocco,James R. Swanson for Michael Rogers,James R. Swanson for Virginia Rogers,James R. Swanson for David Romberg,James R. Swanson for James Rossett,James R. Swanson for Tracey Rossett,James R. Swanson for Joseph Rothbart,James R. Swanson for Richard Rupert,James R. Swanson for Richard Sabo,James R. Swanson for Bernard Sboray,James R. Swanson for Fred Schaefer,James R. Swanson for James Schaefer,James R. Swanson for Sandra Scheman,James R. Swanson for Denise Schiff,James R. Swanson for Robert Schrag,James R. Swanson for Terrance Schreiner,James R. Swanson for Susan Scott,James R. Swanson for Bobby Scruggs,James R. Swanson for Oliver Shackelford,James R. Swanson for Karen Shanahan,James R. Swanson for Dennis Shaughnessy,James R. Swanson for Arshad Sheikh,James R. Swanson for Robert Shockey,James R. Swanson for Werner Sicvol,James R. Swanson for Gerald Siira,James R. Swanson for Richard Siira,James R. Swanson for Robyn Siira,James R. Swanson for Carmen Slominski,James R. Swanson for Edward Smith,James R. Swanson for Jerry Smith,James R. Swanson for DeWanda Smith Soeder,James R. Swanson for Theodore Stagg,James R. Swanson for Joe Stamm,James R. Swanson for Thomas Standing,James R. Swanson for Mark Stiles,James R. Swanson for Daniel Straitiff,James R. Swanson for Michael Surdy,James R. Swanson for Steven Swanson,James R. Swanson for Esther Swertloff,James R. Swanson for Michael Tarjan,James R. Swanson for Susan Taylor,James R. Swanson for Thad Taylor,James R. Swanson for Paul Tennet,James R. Swanson for Susie Thomas,James R. Swanson for Michael Todor,James R. Swanson for Anne Ujczo,James R. Swanson for Anthony Vaccariello,James R. Swanson for Humberto Vainieri,James R. Swanson for Robert Valantas,James R. Swanson for Ronald Valus,James R. Swanson for Phillip Vancil,James R. Swanson for Ronald Vargo,James R. Swanson for Steven Villas,James R. Swanson for Robert Virtue,James R. Swanson for Frederic Wagner,James R. Swanson for Ian Walker,James R. Swanson for Rebecca Barbee Walker,James R. Swanson for Wendy Walker,James R. Swanson for Richard Wall,James R. Swanson for James Walpole,James R. Swanson for Peter Ward,James R. Swanson for Hilary Ware,James R. Swanson for Irma Webb,James R. Swanson for Raymond Weinert,James R. Swanson for Michael Weldy,James R. Swanson for David Williams,James R. Swanson for Willie Williams,James R. Swanson for Steven Wright,James R. Swanson for Thomas Young,James R. Swanson for Joseph Yurkanian,James R. Swanson for David Yusko,James R. Swanson for Robert Zampini,James R. Swanson for Robert Zimpfer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register agai
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/14/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Linda Adamany,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Victor Adams,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John Adzima,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kenneth Alfred,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Toby Alfred,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John Christopher Anderson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Donald Anthony,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Arnold,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Victor Astraitis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Atton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terry Bailey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Noel Bartlett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Peter Bartok,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Leon Bartos,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Suzanne Bassett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Carol Battershell,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jean Beaver,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Randolph Becker,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Bell,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Steven Benz,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dewey Bernu,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Colin Binns,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Brian Blazina,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Bond,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Edward Bonk,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Cynthia Brackett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jeffrey Brame,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Bill Brandt,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Phil Brasse,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Roger Breedlove,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Bridgeman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Laurie Brixius,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Harrison Bubb,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Karen Buchanan,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Vincent Buchtman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Arthur Bumpus,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Burroughs,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Larry Burton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Rodney Butler,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Erskine Cade,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Susan Caito,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Vernell Calhoun,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John Calobrisi,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Cameron,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Doug Campbell,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Karen Carr,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jay Carstenbrock,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Nancy Carter,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Catchpole,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Lynn Centa,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dianne Christensen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Christensen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Gary Christman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Alton Clark,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jeffrey Conrad,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Stephen Cossey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Crabtree,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Crosby,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Burrel Culp,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Cundey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Currier,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Evelyn Davis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Karen DeAngelis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dennis DeWilde,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Donald Debrier,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John Denis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Erika Denman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Doggett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Barney Dotson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Christopher Drysdale,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John Dueker,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Dyar,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Carol Emeruwa,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Gerard Farkas,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Douglas Farris,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Maurice Fauley,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Norma Fink,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Fitzgibbons,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Daniel Flint,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jeffrey Foshee,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Foster,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Paul Fowler,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Alan Freund,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Matthew Fulton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Gaetjens,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Fred Garabaldi,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Garrigan,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kristina Gillespie,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Gilroy,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Walter Ginn,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Pamela Goetsch,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terry Golden,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for George Gonzales,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mark Goodwin,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Doretha Grant,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Adrienne Greben,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Ingrid Gwalthney,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mary Louise Hahn,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for C Michelle Hall,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Hamilton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Peter Hanley,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Judy Hanna,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Holly Hansen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Marion Harris,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Hedra Harrison,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Barbara Harvey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Keath Headen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jean Heflich,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Adelia Heflin,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Nancy Heinen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Ruth Hennie,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mary Lyn Herdt,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Hermiller,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Herrin,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Wendy Hileman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Brian Hitch,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Brenda Hnatiak,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Hollis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Hower,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dennis Hruska,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kent Huey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Bradley Hull,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Barbara Hunt,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Iacoponi,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mark Jablonski,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Walter Jackson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Johnson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dennis Jonke,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mary Jane Joyce,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Deborah Kalmeyer,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Kantelis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Nicole Kantelis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Frank Ronald Kapcsos,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kenneth Keckler,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Roger Klein,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jonathan Klement,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Daryl Kleppin,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Koch,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Todd Korb,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Cheryl Kovatch,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Wally Kowalski,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Courtney Kronk,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Donovan Kuenzli,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Edwin Kuhn,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael LaBeau,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terry LaMore,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kevin Latham,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Laubacher,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Moon Poo Lew,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Denise Lewis,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Lipinski,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Lombardi,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Lynch,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jack Maddux,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Allyson Madsen,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terra Manton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Stephen Marshall,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Clive Richard Maskell,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Matlock,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Matte,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jeanette Woods Matthews,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kevin McCaffrey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Bruce McCrodden,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for John McDonald,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Christopher McKenna,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Stephen McNally,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Donna Meister,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Patricia Mesel,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Minor,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for William Mooney,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Morgan,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kay Morris,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Mower,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Lisa Mundy,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for George Nelson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Neuenschwander,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Karen Newton,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Donald Nyberg,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Linda O'Horo,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terence Obeney,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Osborne,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Betty Oves,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Palmer,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Panek,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for April Paramore,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Pessel,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Pietrick,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Frederic Pondo,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Popkin,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Daniel Porter,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Rick Porter,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Press,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Stephen Repp,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Eugene Braiden Rex,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Timothy Reynolds,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Kellie Rixse,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Earl Robinson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Willa Robinson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Ralph Rocco,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Rogers,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Virginia Rogers,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for David Romberg,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Rossett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Tracey Rossett,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Joseph Rothbart,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Rupert,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Sabo,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Bernard Sboray,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Fred Schaefer,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for James Schaefer,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Sandra Scheman,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Denise Schiff,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Schrag,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Terrance Schreiner,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Susan Scott,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Bobby Scruggs,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Oliver Shackelford,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Karen Shanahan,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Dennis Shaughnessy,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Arshad Sheikh,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robert Shockey,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Werner Sicvol,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Gerald Siira,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Richard Siira,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Robyn Siira,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Carmen Slominski,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Edward Smith,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Jerry Smith,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for DeWanda Smith Soeder,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Theodore Stagg,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Joe Stamm,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thomas Standing,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Mark Stiles,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Daniel Straitiff,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Surdy,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Steven Swanson,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Esther Swertloff,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Tarjan,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Susan Taylor,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Thad Taylor,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Paul Tennet,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Susie Thomas,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Michael Todor,Caroline Hogan Pashcal for Anne U
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/14/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Rebekka C. Veith for Linda Adamany,Rebekka C. Veith for Victor Adams,Rebekka C. Veith for John Adzima,Rebekka C. Veith for Kenneth Alfred,Rebekka C. Veith for Toby Alfred,Rebekka C. Veith for John Christopher Anderson,Rebekka C. Veith for Donald Anthony,Rebekka C. Veith for David Arnold,Rebekka C. Veith for Victor Astraitis,Rebekka C. Veith for David Atton,Rebekka C. Veith for Terry Bailey,Rebekka C. Veith for Noel Bartlett,Rebekka C. Veith for Peter Bartok,Rebekka C. Veith for Leon Bartos,Rebekka C. Veith for Suzanne Bassett,Rebekka C. Veith for Carol Battershell,Rebekka C. Veith for Jean Beaver,Rebekka C. Veith for Randolph Becker,Rebekka C. Veith for David Bell,Rebekka C. Veith for Steven Benz,Rebekka C. Veith for Dewey Bernu,Rebekka C. Veith for Colin Binns,Rebekka C. Veith for Brian Blazina,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Bond,Rebekka C. Veith for Edward Bonk,Rebekka C. Veith for Cynthia Brackett,Rebekka C. Veith for Jeffrey Brame,Rebekka C. Veith for Bill Brandt,Rebekka C. Veith for Phil Brasse,Rebekka C. Veith for Roger Breedlove,Rebekka C. Veith for David Bridgeman,Rebekka C. Veith for Laurie Brixius,Rebekka C. Veith for Harrison Bubb,Rebekka C. Veith for Karen Buchanan,Rebekka C. Veith for Vincent Buchtman,Rebekka C. Veith for Arthur Bumpus,Rebekka C. Veith for James Burroughs,Rebekka C. Veith for Larry Burton,Rebekka C. Veith for Rodney Butler,Rebekka C. Veith for Erskine Cade,Rebekka C. Veith for Susan Caito,Rebekka C. Veith for Vernell Calhoun,Rebekka C. Veith for John Calobrisi,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Cameron,Rebekka C. Veith for Doug Campbell,Rebekka C. Veith for Karen Carr,Rebekka C. Veith for Jay Carstenbrock,Rebekka C. Veith for Nancy Carter,Rebekka C. Veith for David Catchpole,Rebekka C. Veith for Lynn Centa,Rebekka C. Veith for Dianne Christensen,Rebekka C. Veith for William Christensen,Rebekka C. Veith for Gary Christman,Rebekka C. Veith for Alton Clark,Rebekka C. Veith for Jeffrey Conrad,Rebekka C. Veith for Stephen Cossey,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Crabtree,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Crosby,Rebekka C. Veith for Burrel Culp,Rebekka C. Veith for James Cundey,Rebekka C. Veith for William Currier,Rebekka C. Veith for Evelyn Davis,Rebekka C. Veith for Karen DeAngelis,Rebekka C. Veith for Dennis DeWilde,Rebekka C. Veith for Donald Debrier,Rebekka C. Veith for John Denis,Rebekka C. Veith for Erika Denman,Rebekka C. Veith for William Doggett,Rebekka C. Veith for Barney Dotson,Rebekka C. Veith for Christopher Drysdale,Rebekka C. Veith for John Dueker,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Dyar,Rebekka C. Veith for Carol Emeruwa,Rebekka C. Veith for Gerard Farkas,Rebekka C. Veith for Douglas Farris,Rebekka C. Veith for Maurice Fauley,Rebekka C. Veith for Norma Fink,Rebekka C. Veith for William Fitzgibbons,Rebekka C. Veith for Daniel Flint,Rebekka C. Veith for Jeffrey Foshee,Rebekka C. Veith for James Foster,Rebekka C. Veith for Paul Fowler,Rebekka C. Veith for Alan Freund,Rebekka C. Veith for Matthew Fulton,Rebekka C. Veith for David Gaetjens,Rebekka C. Veith for Fred Garabaldi,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Garrigan,Rebekka C. Veith for Kristina Gillespie,Rebekka C. Veith for James Gilroy,Rebekka C. Veith for Walter Ginn,Rebekka C. Veith for Pamela Goetsch,Rebekka C. Veith for Terry Golden,Rebekka C. Veith for George Gonzales,Rebekka C. Veith for Mark Goodwin,Rebekka C. Veith for Doretha Grant,Rebekka C. Veith for Adrienne Greben,Rebekka C. Veith for Ingrid Gwalthney,Rebekka C. Veith for Mary Louise Hahn,Rebekka C. Veith for C Michelle Hall,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Hamilton,Rebekka C. Veith for Peter Hanley,Rebekka C. Veith for Judy Hanna,Rebekka C. Veith for Holly Hansen,Rebekka C. Veith for Marion Harris,Rebekka C. Veith for Hedra Harrison,Rebekka C. Veith for Barbara Harvey,Rebekka C. Veith for Keath Headen,Rebekka C. Veith for Jean Heflich,Rebekka C. Veith for Adelia Heflin,Rebekka C. Veith for Nancy Heinen,Rebekka C. Veith for Ruth Hennie,Rebekka C. Veith for Mary Lyn Herdt,Rebekka C. Veith for James Hermiller,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Herrin,Rebekka C. Veith for Wendy Hileman,Rebekka C. Veith for Brian Hitch,Rebekka C. Veith for Brenda Hnatiak,Rebekka C. Veith for William Hollis,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Hower,Rebekka C. Veith for Dennis Hruska,Rebekka C. Veith for Kent Huey,Rebekka C. Veith for Bradley Hull,Rebekka C. Veith for Barbara Hunt,Rebekka C. Veith for James Iacoponi,Rebekka C. Veith for Mark Jablonski,Rebekka C. Veith for Walter Jackson,Rebekka C. Veith for James Johnson,Rebekka C. Veith for Dennis Jonke,Rebekka C. Veith for Mary Jane Joyce,Rebekka C. Veith for Deborah Kalmeyer,Rebekka C. Veith for James Kantelis,Rebekka C. Veith for Nicole Kantelis,Rebekka C. Veith for Frank Ronald Kapcsos,Rebekka C. Veith for Kenneth Keckler,Rebekka C. Veith for Roger Klein,Rebekka C. Veith for Jonathan Klement,Rebekka C. Veith for Daryl Kleppin,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Koch,Rebekka C. Veith for Todd Korb,Rebekka C. Veith for Cheryl Kovatch,Rebekka C. Veith for Wally Kowalski,Rebekka C. Veith for Courtney Kronk,Rebekka C. Veith for Donovan Kuenzli,Rebekka C. Veith for Edwin Kuhn,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael LaBeau,Rebekka C. Veith for Terry LaMore,Rebekka C. Veith for Kevin Latham,Rebekka C. Veith for James Laubacher,Rebekka C. Veith for Moon Poo Lew,Rebekka C. Veith for Denise Lewis,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Lipinski,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Lombardi,Rebekka C. Veith for William Lynch,Rebekka C. Veith for Jack Maddux,Rebekka C. Veith for Allyson Madsen,Rebekka C. Veith for Terra Manton,Rebekka C. Veith for Stephen Marshall,Rebekka C. Veith for Clive Richard Maskell,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Matlock,Rebekka C. Veith for William Matte,Rebekka C. Veith for Jeanette Woods Matthews,Rebekka C. Veith for Kevin McCaffrey,Rebekka C. Veith for Bruce McCrodden,Rebekka C. Veith for John McDonald,Rebekka C. Veith for Christopher McKenna,Rebekka C. Veith for Stephen McNally,Rebekka C. Veith for Donna Meister,Rebekka C. Veith for Patricia Mesel,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Minor,Rebekka C. Veith for William Mooney,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Morgan,Rebekka C. Veith for Kay Morris,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Mower,Rebekka C. Veith for Lisa Mundy,Rebekka C. Veith for George Nelson,Rebekka C. Veith for James Neuenschwander,Rebekka C. Veith for Karen Newton,Rebekka C. Veith for Donald Nyberg,Rebekka C. Veith for Linda O'Horo,Rebekka C. Veith for Terence Obeney,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Osborne,Rebekka C. Veith for Betty Oves,Rebekka C. Veith for James Palmer,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Panek,Rebekka C. Veith for April Paramore,Rebekka C. Veith for David Pessel,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Pietrick,Rebekka C. Veith for Frederic Pondo,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Popkin,Rebekka C. Veith for Daniel Porter,Rebekka C. Veith for Rick Porter,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Press,Rebekka C. Veith for Stephen Repp,Rebekka C. Veith for Eugene Braiden Rex,Rebekka C. Veith for Timothy Reynolds,Rebekka C. Veith for Kellie Rixse,Rebekka C. Veith for Earl Robinson,Rebekka C. Veith for Willa Robinson,Rebekka C. Veith for Ralph Rocco,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Rogers,Rebekka C. Veith for Virginia Rogers,Rebekka C. Veith for David Romberg,Rebekka C. Veith for James Rossett,Rebekka C. Veith for Tracey Rossett,Rebekka C. Veith for Joseph Rothbart,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Rupert,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Sabo,Rebekka C. Veith for Bernard Sboray,Rebekka C. Veith for Fred Schaefer,Rebekka C. Veith for James Schaefer,Rebekka C. Veith for Sandra Scheman,Rebekka C. Veith for Denise Schiff,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Schrag,Rebekka C. Veith for Terrance Schreiner,Rebekka C. Veith for Susan Scott,Rebekka C. Veith for Bobby Scruggs,Rebekka C. Veith for Oliver Shackelford,Rebekka C. Veith for Karen Shanahan,Rebekka C. Veith for Dennis Shaughnessy,Rebekka C. Veith for Arshad Sheikh,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Shockey,Rebekka C. Veith for Werner Sicvol,Rebekka C. Veith for Gerald Siira,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Siira,Rebekka C. Veith for Robyn Siira,Rebekka C. Veith for Carmen Slominski,Rebekka C. Veith for Edward Smith,Rebekka C. Veith for Jerry Smith,Rebekka C. Veith for DeWanda Smith Soeder,Rebekka C. Veith for Theodore Stagg,Rebekka C. Veith for Joe Stamm,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Standing,Rebekka C. Veith for Mark Stiles,Rebekka C. Veith for Daniel Straitiff,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Surdy,Rebekka C. Veith for Steven Swanson,Rebekka C. Veith for Esther Swertloff,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Tarjan,Rebekka C. Veith for Susan Taylor,Rebekka C. Veith for Thad Taylor,Rebekka C. Veith for Paul Tennet,Rebekka C. Veith for Susie Thomas,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Todor,Rebekka C. Veith for Anne Ujczo,Rebekka C. Veith for Anthony Vaccariello,Rebekka C. Veith for Humberto Vainieri,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Valantas,Rebekka C. Veith for Ronald Valus,Rebekka C. Veith for Phillip Vancil,Rebekka C. Veith for Ronald Vargo,Rebekka C. Veith for Steven Villas,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Virtue,Rebekka C. Veith for Frederic Wagner,Rebekka C. Veith for Ian Walker,Rebekka C. Veith for Rebecca Barbee Walker,Rebekka C. Veith for Wendy Walker,Rebekka C. Veith for Richard Wall,Rebekka C. Veith for James Walpole,Rebekka C. Veith for Peter Ward,Rebekka C. Veith for Hilary Ware,Rebekka C. Veith for Irma Webb,Rebekka C. Veith for Raymond Weinert,Rebekka C. Veith for Michael Weldy,Rebekka C. Veith for David Williams,Rebekka C. Veith for Willie Williams,Rebekka C. Veith for Steven Wright,Rebekka C. Veith for Thomas Young,Rebekka C. Veith for Joseph Yurkanian,Rebekka C. Veith for David Yusko,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Zampini,Rebekka C. Veith for Robert Zimpfer. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register agai
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Signed Affidavit] filed by Michael Press, Linda Adamany, Victor Adams, John Adzima, Kenneth Alfred, Toby Alfred, John Anderson, Donald Anthony, David Arnold, Victor Astraitis, David Atton, Terry Bailey, Noel Bartlett, Peter Bartok, Leon Bartos, Suzanne Bassett, Carol Battershell, Jean Beaver, Randolph Becker, David Bell, Steven Benz, Dewey Bernu, Colin Binns, Brian Blazina, Thomas Bond, Edward Bonk, Cynthia Brackett, Jeffrey Brame, Bill Brandt, Phil Brasse, Roger Breedlove, David Bridgeman, Laurie Brixius, Harrison Bubb, Karen Buchanan, Vincent Buchtman, Arthur Bumpus, James Burroughs, Larry Burton, Rodney Butler, Erskine Cade, Susan Caito, Vernell Calhoun, John Calobrisi, Robert Cameron, Doug Campbell, Karen Carr, Jay Carstenbrock, Nancy Carter, David Catchpole, Lynn Centa, Dianne Christensen, William Christensen, Gary Christman, Alton Clark, Jeffrey Conrad, Stephen Cossey, Richard Crabtree, Richard Crosby, Burrel Culp, James Cundey, William Currier, Evelyn Davis, Donald Debrier, Karen DeAngelis, John Denis, Erika Denman, Dennis DeWilde, William Doggett, Barney Dotson, Christopher Drysdale, John Dueker, Robert Dyar, Carol Emeruwa, Gerard Farkas, Douglas Farris, Maurice Fauley, Norma Fink, William Fitzgibbons, Daniel Flint, Jeffrey Foshee, James Foster, Paul Fowler, Alan Freund, Matthew Fulton, David Gaetjens, Fred Garabaldi, Michael Garrigan, Kristina Gillespie, James Gilroy, Walter Ginn, Pamela Goetsch, Terry Golden, George Gonzales, Mark Goodwin, Doretha Grant, Adrienne Greben, Ingrid Gwalthney, Mary Hahn, C Hall, Thomas Hamilton, Peter Hanley, Judy Hanna, Holly Hansen, Marion Harris, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Harvey, Keath Headen, Jean Heflich, Adelia Heflin, Nancy Heinen, Ruth Hennie, Mary Herdt, James Hermiller, Robert Herrin, Wendy Hileman, Brian Hitch, Brenda Hnatiak, William Hollis, Thomas Hower, Dennis Hruska, Kent Huey, Bradley Hull, Barbara Hunt, Mark Jablonski, Walter Jackson, James Johnson, Dennis Jonke, Mary Joyce, Deborah Kalmeyer, James Kantelis, Nicole Kantelis, Frank Kapcsos, Kenneth Keckler, Roger Klein, Jonathan Klement, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Koch, Todd Korb, Cheryl Kovatch, Wally Kowalski, Courtney Kronk, Donovan Kuenzli, Edwin Kuhn, Michael LaBeau, Terry LaMore, Kevin Latham, James Laubacher, Moon Lew, Denise Lewis, Richard Lipinski, Michael Lombardi, William Lynch, Jack Maddux, Allyson Madsen, Terra Manton, Stephen Marshall, Clive Maskell, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Jeanette Matthews, Kevin McCaffrey, Bruce McCrodden, John McDonald, Christopher McKenna, Stephen McNally, Donna Meister, Patricia Mesel, Michael Minor, William Mooney, Michael Morgan, Kay Morris, Michael Mower, Lisa Mundy, George Nelson, Karen Newton, James Neuenschwander, Donald Nyberg, Terence Obeney, Linda O'Horo, Michael Osborne, Betty Oves, James Palmer, Richard Panek, April Paramore, David Pessel, Robert Pietrick, Frederic Pondo, Michael Popkin, Daniel Porter, Rick Porter, Stephen Repp, Eugene Rex, Timothy Reynolds, Kellie Rixse, Earl Robinson, Willa Robinson, Ralph Rocco, Michael Rogers, Virginia Rogers, David Romberg, James Rossett, Tracey Rossett, Joseph Rothbart, Richard Rupert, Richard Sabo, Bernard Sboray, James Schaefer, Fred Schaefer, Sandra Scheman, Denise Schiff, Robert Schrag, Terrance Schreiner, Susan Scott, Bobby Scruggs, Oliver Shackelford, Karen Shanahan, Dennis Shaughnessy, Arshad Sheikh, Robert Shockey, Werner Sicvol, Gerald Siira, Richard Siira, Robyn Siira, Carmen Slominski, DeWanda Soeder, Edward Smith, Jerry Smith, Theodore Stagg, Joe Stamm, Thomas Standing, Mark Stiles, Daniel Straitiff, Michael Surdy, Steven Swanson, Esther Swertloff, Michael Tarjan, Susan Taylor, Thad Taylor, Paul Tennet, Susie Thomas, Michael Todor, Anne Ujczo, Anthony Vaccariello, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Valantas, Ronald Valus, Phillip Vancil, Ronald Vargo, Steven Villas, Robert Virtue, Frederic Wagner, Ian Walker, Wendy Walker, Richard Wall, James Walpole, Peter Ward, Hilary Ware, Raymond Weinert, Michael Weldy, David Williams, Willie Williams, Steven Wright, Thomas Young, Joseph Yurkanian, David Yusko, Robert Zampini, Robert Zimpfer, Irma Webb, James Iacoponi, Rebecca Walker. Related document(s) #11 . (Boyle, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Signed Affidavit] filed by Michael Press, Linda Adamany, Victor Adams, John Adzima, Kenneth Alfred, Toby Alfred, John Anderson, Donald Anthony, David Arnold, Victor Astraitis, David Atton, Terry Bailey, Noel Bartlett, Peter Bartok, Leon Bartos, Suzanne Bassett, Carol Battershell, Jean Beaver, Randolph Becker, David Bell, Steven Benz, Dewey Bernu, Colin Binns, Brian Blazina, Thomas Bond, Edward Bonk, Cynthia Brackett, Jeffrey Brame, Bill Brandt, Phil Brasse, Roger Breedlove, David Bridgeman, Laurie Brixius, Harrison Bubb, Karen Buchanan, Vincent Buchtman, Arthur Bumpus, James Burroughs, Larry Burton, Rodney Butler, Erskine Cade, Susan Caito, Vernell Calhoun, John Calobrisi, Robert Cameron, Doug Campbell, Karen Carr, Jay Carstenbrock, Nancy Carter, David Catchpole, Lynn Centa, Dianne Christensen, William Christensen, Gary Christman, Alton Clark, Jeffrey Conrad, Stephen Cossey, Richard Crabtree, Richard Crosby, Burrel Culp, James Cundey, William Currier, Evelyn Davis, Donald Debrier, Karen DeAngelis, John Denis, Erika Denman, Dennis DeWilde, William Doggett, Barney Dotson, Christopher Drysdale, John Dueker, Robert Dyar, Carol Emeruwa, Gerard Farkas, Douglas Farris, Maurice Fauley, Norma Fink, William Fitzgibbons, Daniel Flint, Jeffrey Foshee, James Foster, Paul Fowler, Alan Freund, Matthew Fulton, David Gaetjens, Fred Garabaldi, Michael Garrigan, Kristina Gillespie, James Gilroy, Walter Ginn, Pamela Goetsch, Terry Golden, George Gonzales, Mark Goodwin, Doretha Grant, Adrienne Greben, Ingrid Gwalthney, Mary Hahn, C Hall, Thomas Hamilton, Peter Hanley, Judy Hanna, Holly Hansen, Marion Harris, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Harvey, Keath Headen, Jean Heflich, Adelia Heflin, Nancy Heinen, Ruth Hennie, Mary Herdt, James Hermiller, Robert Herrin, Wendy Hileman, Brian Hitch, Brenda Hnatiak, William Hollis, Thomas Hower, Dennis Hruska, Kent Huey, Bradley Hull, Barbara Hunt, Mark Jablonski, Walter Jackson, James Johnson, Dennis Jonke, Mary Joyce, Deborah Kalmeyer, James Kantelis, Nicole Kantelis, Frank Kapcsos, Kenneth Keckler, Roger Klein, Jonathan Klement, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Koch, Todd Korb, Cheryl Kovatch, Wally Kowalski, Courtney Kronk, Donovan Kuenzli, Edwin Kuhn, Michael LaBeau, Terry LaMore, Kevin Latham, James Laubacher, Moon Lew, Denise Lewis, Richard Lipinski, Michael Lombardi, William Lynch, Jack Maddux, Allyson Madsen, Terra Manton, Stephen Marshall, Clive Maskell, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Jeanette Matthews, Kevin McCaffrey, Bruce McCrodden, John McDonald, Christopher McKenna, Stephen McNally, Donna Meister, Patricia Mesel, Michael Minor, William Mooney, Michael Morgan, Kay Morris, Michael Mower, Lisa Mundy, George Nelson, Karen Newton, James Neuenschwander, Donald Nyberg, Terence Obeney, Linda O'Horo, Michael Osborne, Betty Oves, James Palmer, Richard Panek, April Paramore, David Pessel, Robert Pietrick, Frederic Pondo, Michael Popkin, Daniel Porter, Rick Porter, Stephen Repp, Eugene Rex, Timothy Reynolds, Kellie Rixse, Earl Robinson, Willa Robinson, Ralph Rocco, Michael Rogers, Virginia Rogers, David Romberg, James Rossett, Tracey Rossett, Joseph Rothbart, Richard Rupert, Richard Sabo, Bernard Sboray, James Schaefer, Fred Schaefer, Sandra Scheman, Denise Schiff, Robert Schrag, Terrance Schreiner, Susan Scott, Bobby Scruggs, Oliver Shackelford, Karen Shanahan, Dennis Shaughnessy, Arshad Sheikh, Robert Shockey, Werner Sicvol, Gerald Siira, Richard Siira, Robyn Siira, Carmen Slominski, DeWanda Soeder, Edward Smith, Jerry Smith, Theodore Stagg, Joe Stamm, Thomas Standing, Mark Stiles, Daniel Straitiff, Michael Surdy, Steven Swanson, Esther Swertloff, Michael Tarjan, Susan Taylor, Thad Taylor, Paul Tennet, Susie Thomas, Michael Todor, Anne Ujczo, Anthony Vaccariello, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Valantas, Ronald Valus, Phillip Vancil, Ronald Vargo, Steven Villas, Robert Virtue, Frederic Wagner, Ian Walker, Wendy Walker, Richard Wall, James Walpole, Peter Ward, Hilary Ware, Raymond Weinert, Michael Weldy, David Williams, Willie Williams, Steven Wright, Thomas Young, Joseph Yurkanian, David Yusko, Robert Zampini, Robert Zimpfer, Irma Webb, James Iacoponi, Rebecca Walker. Related document(s) #9 . (Boyle, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Signed Affidavit] filed by Michael Press, Linda Adamany, Victor Adams, John Adzima, Kenneth Alfred, Toby Alfred, John Anderson, Donald Anthony, David Arnold, Victor Astraitis, David Atton, Terry Bailey, Noel Bartlett, Peter Bartok, Leon Bartos, Suzanne Bassett, Carol Battershell, Jean Beaver, Randolph Becker, David Bell, Steven Benz, Dewey Bernu, Colin Binns, Brian Blazina, Thomas Bond, Edward Bonk, Cynthia Brackett, Jeffrey Brame, Bill Brandt, Phil Brasse, Roger Breedlove, David Bridgeman, Laurie Brixius, Harrison Bubb, Karen Buchanan, Vincent Buchtman, Arthur Bumpus, James Burroughs, Larry Burton, Rodney Butler, Erskine Cade, Susan Caito, Vernell Calhoun, John Calobrisi, Robert Cameron, Doug Campbell, Karen Carr, Jay Carstenbrock, Nancy Carter, David Catchpole, Lynn Centa, Dianne Christensen, William Christensen, Gary Christman, Alton Clark, Jeffrey Conrad, Stephen Cossey, Richard Crabtree, Richard Crosby, Burrel Culp, James Cundey, William Currier, Evelyn Davis, Donald Debrier, Karen DeAngelis, John Denis, Erika Denman, Dennis DeWilde, William Doggett, Barney Dotson, Christopher Drysdale, John Dueker, Robert Dyar, Carol Emeruwa, Gerard Farkas, Douglas Farris, Maurice Fauley, Norma Fink, William Fitzgibbons, Daniel Flint, Jeffrey Foshee, James Foster, Paul Fowler, Alan Freund, Matthew Fulton, David Gaetjens, Fred Garabaldi, Michael Garrigan, Kristina Gillespie, James Gilroy, Walter Ginn, Pamela Goetsch, Terry Golden, George Gonzales, Mark Goodwin, Doretha Grant, Adrienne Greben, Ingrid Gwalthney, Mary Hahn, C Hall, Thomas Hamilton, Peter Hanley, Judy Hanna, Holly Hansen, Marion Harris, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Harvey, Keath Headen, Jean Heflich, Adelia Heflin, Nancy Heinen, Ruth Hennie, Mary Herdt, James Hermiller, Robert Herrin, Wendy Hileman, Brian Hitch, Brenda Hnatiak, William Hollis, Thomas Hower, Dennis Hruska, Kent Huey, Bradley Hull, Barbara Hunt, Mark Jablonski, Walter Jackson, James Johnson, Dennis Jonke, Mary Joyce, Deborah Kalmeyer, James Kantelis, Nicole Kantelis, Frank Kapcsos, Kenneth Keckler, Roger Klein, Jonathan Klement, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Koch, Todd Korb, Cheryl Kovatch, Wally Kowalski, Courtney Kronk, Donovan Kuenzli, Edwin Kuhn, Michael LaBeau, Terry LaMore, Kevin Latham, James Laubacher, Moon Lew, Denise Lewis, Richard Lipinski, Michael Lombardi, William Lynch, Jack Maddux, Allyson Madsen, Terra Manton, Stephen Marshall, Clive Maskell, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Jeanette Matthews, Kevin McCaffrey, Bruce McCrodden, John McDonald, Christopher McKenna, Stephen McNally, Donna Meister, Patricia Mesel, Michael Minor, William Mooney, Michael Morgan, Kay Morris, Michael Mower, Lisa Mundy, George Nelson, Karen Newton, James Neuenschwander, Donald Nyberg, Terence Obeney, Linda O'Horo, Michael Osborne, Betty Oves, James Palmer, Richard Panek, April Paramore, David Pessel, Robert Pietrick, Frederic Pondo, Michael Popkin, Daniel Porter, Rick Porter, Stephen Repp, Eugene Rex, Timothy Reynolds, Kellie Rixse, Earl Robinson, Willa Robinson, Ralph Rocco, Michael Rogers, Virginia Rogers, David Romberg, James Rossett, Tracey Rossett, Joseph Rothbart, Richard Rupert, Richard Sabo, Bernard Sboray, James Schaefer, Fred Schaefer, Sandra Scheman, Denise Schiff, Robert Schrag, Terrance Schreiner, Susan Scott, Bobby Scruggs, Oliver Shackelford, Karen Shanahan, Dennis Shaughnessy, Arshad Sheikh, Robert Shockey, Werner Sicvol, Gerald Siira, Richard Siira, Robyn Siira, Carmen Slominski, DeWanda Soeder, Edward Smith, Jerry Smith, Theodore Stagg, Joe Stamm, Thomas Standing, Mark Stiles, Daniel Straitiff, Michael Surdy, Steven Swanson, Esther Swertloff, Michael Tarjan, Susan Taylor, Thad Taylor, Paul Tennet, Susie Thomas, Michael Todor, Anne Ujczo, Anthony Vaccariello, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Valantas, Ronald Valus, Phillip Vancil, Ronald Vargo, Steven Villas, Robert Virtue, Frederic Wagner, Ian Walker, Wendy Walker, Richard Wall, James Walpole, Peter Ward, Hilary Ware, Raymond Weinert, Michael Weldy, David Williams, Willie Williams, Steven Wright, Thomas Young, Joseph Yurkanian, David Yusko, Robert Zampini, Robert Zimpfer, Irma Webb, James Iacoponi, Rebecca Walker. Related document(s) #8 . (Boyle, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Signed Affidavit] filed by Michael Press, Linda Adamany, Victor Adams, John Adzima, Kenneth Alfred, Toby Alfred, John Anderson, Donald Anthony, David Arnold, Victor Astraitis, David Atton, Terry Bailey, Noel Bartlett, Peter Bartok, Leon Bartos, Suzanne Bassett, Carol Battershell, Jean Beaver, Randolph Becker, David Bell, Steven Benz, Dewey Bernu, Colin Binns, Brian Blazina, Thomas Bond, Edward Bonk, Cynthia Brackett, Jeffrey Brame, Bill Brandt, Phil Brasse, Roger Breedlove, David Bridgeman, Laurie Brixius, Harrison Bubb, Karen Buchanan, Vincent Buchtman, Arthur Bumpus, James Burroughs, Larry Burton, Rodney Butler, Erskine Cade, Susan Caito, Vernell Calhoun, John Calobrisi, Robert Cameron, Doug Campbell, Karen Carr, Jay Carstenbrock, Nancy Carter, David Catchpole, Lynn Centa, Dianne Christensen, William Christensen, Gary Christman, Alton Clark, Jeffrey Conrad, Stephen Cossey, Richard Crabtree, Richard Crosby, Burrel Culp, James Cundey, William Currier, Evelyn Davis, Donald Debrier, Karen DeAngelis, John Denis, Erika Denman, Dennis DeWilde, William Doggett, Barney Dotson, Christopher Drysdale, John Dueker, Robert Dyar, Carol Emeruwa, Gerard Farkas, Douglas Farris, Maurice Fauley, Norma Fink, William Fitzgibbons, Daniel Flint, Jeffrey Foshee, James Foster, Paul Fowler, Alan Freund, Matthew Fulton, David Gaetjens, Fred Garabaldi, Michael Garrigan, Kristina Gillespie, James Gilroy, Walter Ginn, Pamela Goetsch, Terry Golden, George Gonzales, Mark Goodwin, Doretha Grant, Adrienne Greben, Ingrid Gwalthney, Mary Hahn, C Hall, Thomas Hamilton, Peter Hanley, Judy Hanna, Holly Hansen, Marion Harris, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Harvey, Keath Headen, Jean Heflich, Adelia Heflin, Nancy Heinen, Ruth Hennie, Mary Herdt, James Hermiller, Robert Herrin, Wendy Hileman, Brian Hitch, Brenda Hnatiak, William Hollis, Thomas Hower, Dennis Hruska, Kent Huey, Bradley Hull, Barbara Hunt, Mark Jablonski, Walter Jackson, James Johnson, Dennis Jonke, Mary Joyce, Deborah Kalmeyer, James Kantelis, Nicole Kantelis, Frank Kapcsos, Kenneth Keckler, Roger Klein, Jonathan Klement, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Koch, Todd Korb, Cheryl Kovatch, Wally Kowalski, Courtney Kronk, Donovan Kuenzli, Edwin Kuhn, Michael LaBeau, Terry LaMore, Kevin Latham, James Laubacher, Moon Lew, Denise Lewis, Richard Lipinski, Michael Lombardi, William Lynch, Jack Maddux, Allyson Madsen, Terra Manton, Stephen Marshall, Clive Maskell, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Jeanette Matthews, Kevin McCaffrey, Bruce McCrodden, John McDonald, Christopher McKenna, Stephen McNally, Donna Meister, Patricia Mesel, Michael Minor, William Mooney, Michael Morgan, Kay Morris, Michael Mower, Lisa Mundy, George Nelson, Karen Newton, James Neuenschwander, Donald Nyberg, Terence Obeney, Linda O'Horo, Michael Osborne, Betty Oves, James Palmer, Richard Panek, April Paramore, David Pessel, Robert Pietrick, Frederic Pondo, Michael Popkin, Daniel Porter, Rick Porter, Stephen Repp, Eugene Rex, Timothy Reynolds, Kellie Rixse, Earl Robinson, Willa Robinson, Ralph Rocco, Michael Rogers, Virginia Rogers, David Romberg, James Rossett, Tracey Rossett, Joseph Rothbart, Richard Rupert, Richard Sabo, Bernard Sboray, James Schaefer, Fred Schaefer, Sandra Scheman, Denise Schiff, Robert Schrag, Terrance Schreiner, Susan Scott, Bobby Scruggs, Oliver Shackelford, Karen Shanahan, Dennis Shaughnessy, Arshad Sheikh, Robert Shockey, Werner Sicvol, Gerald Siira, Richard Siira, Robyn Siira, Carmen Slominski, DeWanda Soeder, Edward Smith, Jerry Smith, Theodore Stagg, Joe Stamm, Thomas Standing, Mark Stiles, Daniel Straitiff, Michael Surdy, Steven Swanson, Esther Swertloff, Michael Tarjan, Susan Taylor, Thad Taylor, Paul Tennet, Susie Thomas, Michael Todor, Anne Ujczo, Anthony Vaccariello, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Valantas, Ronald Valus, Phillip Vancil, Ronald Vargo, Steven Villas, Robert Virtue, Frederic Wagner, Ian Walker, Wendy Walker, Richard Wall, James Walpole, Peter Ward, Hilary Ware, Raymond Weinert, Michael Weldy, David Williams, Willie Williams, Steven Wright, Thomas Young, Joseph Yurkanian, David Yusko, Robert Zampini, Robert Zimpfer, Irma Webb, James Iacoponi, Rebecca Walker. Related document(s) #7 . (Boyle, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Signed Affidavit] filed by Michael Press, Linda Adamany, Victor Adams, John Adzima, Kenneth Alfred, Toby Alfred, John Anderson, Donald Anthony, David Arnold, Victor Astraitis, David Atton, Terry Bailey, Noel Bartlett, Peter Bartok, Leon Bartos, Suzanne Bassett, Carol Battershell, Jean Beaver, Randolph Becker, David Bell, Steven Benz, Dewey Bernu, Colin Binns, Brian Blazina, Thomas Bond, Edward Bonk, Cynthia Brackett, Jeffrey Brame, Bill Brandt, Phil Brasse, Roger Breedlove, David Bridgeman, Laurie Brixius, Harrison Bubb, Karen Buchanan, Vincent Buchtman, Arthur Bumpus, James Burroughs, Larry Burton, Rodney Butler, Erskine Cade, Susan Caito, Vernell Calhoun, John Calobrisi, Robert Cameron, Doug Campbell, Karen Carr, Jay Carstenbrock, Nancy Carter, David Catchpole, Lynn Centa, Dianne Christensen, William Christensen, Gary Christman, Alton Clark, Jeffrey Conrad, Stephen Cossey, Richard Crabtree, Richard Crosby, Burrel Culp, James Cundey, William Currier, Evelyn Davis, Donald Debrier, Karen DeAngelis, John Denis, Erika Denman, Dennis DeWilde, William Doggett, Barney Dotson, Christopher Drysdale, John Dueker, Robert Dyar, Carol Emeruwa, Gerard Farkas, Douglas Farris, Maurice Fauley, Norma Fink, William Fitzgibbons, Daniel Flint, Jeffrey Foshee, James Foster, Paul Fowler, Alan Freund, Matthew Fulton, David Gaetjens, Fred Garabaldi, Michael Garrigan, Kristina Gillespie, James Gilroy, Walter Ginn, Pamela Goetsch, Terry Golden, George Gonzales, Mark Goodwin, Doretha Grant, Adrienne Greben, Ingrid Gwalthney, Mary Hahn, C Hall, Thomas Hamilton, Peter Hanley, Judy Hanna, Holly Hansen, Marion Harris, Hedra Harrison, Barbara Harvey, Keath Headen, Jean Heflich, Adelia Heflin, Nancy Heinen, Ruth Hennie, Mary Herdt, James Hermiller, Robert Herrin, Wendy Hileman, Brian Hitch, Brenda Hnatiak, William Hollis, Thomas Hower, Dennis Hruska, Kent Huey, Bradley Hull, Barbara Hunt, Mark Jablonski, Walter Jackson, James Johnson, Dennis Jonke, Mary Joyce, Deborah Kalmeyer, James Kantelis, Nicole Kantelis, Frank Kapcsos, Kenneth Keckler, Roger Klein, Jonathan Klement, Daryl Kleppin, Thomas Koch, Todd Korb, Cheryl Kovatch, Wally Kowalski, Courtney Kronk, Donovan Kuenzli, Edwin Kuhn, Michael LaBeau, Terry LaMore, Kevin Latham, James Laubacher, Moon Lew, Denise Lewis, Richard Lipinski, Michael Lombardi, William Lynch, Jack Maddux, Allyson Madsen, Terra Manton, Stephen Marshall, Clive Maskell, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Jeanette Matthews, Kevin McCaffrey, Bruce McCrodden, John McDonald, Christopher McKenna, Stephen McNally, Donna Meister, Patricia Mesel, Michael Minor, William Mooney, Michael Morgan, Kay Morris, Michael Mower, Lisa Mundy, George Nelson, Karen Newton, James Neuenschwander, Donald Nyberg, Terence Obeney, Linda O'Horo, Michael Osborne, Betty Oves, James Palmer, Richard Panek, April Paramore, David Pessel, Robert Pietrick, Frederic Pondo, Michael Popkin, Daniel Porter, Rick Porter, Stephen Repp, Eugene Rex, Timothy Reynolds, Kellie Rixse, Earl Robinson, Willa Robinson, Ralph Rocco, Michael Rogers, Virginia Rogers, David Romberg, James Rossett, Tracey Rossett, Joseph Rothbart, Richard Rupert, Richard Sabo, Bernard Sboray, James Schaefer, Fred Schaefer, Sandra Scheman, Denise Schiff, Robert Schrag, Terrance Schreiner, Susan Scott, Bobby Scruggs, Oliver Shackelford, Karen Shanahan, Dennis Shaughnessy, Arshad Sheikh, Robert Shockey, Werner Sicvol, Gerald Siira, Richard Siira, Robyn Siira, Carmen Slominski, DeWanda Soeder, Edward Smith, Jerry Smith, Theodore Stagg, Joe Stamm, Thomas Standing, Mark Stiles, Daniel Straitiff, Michael Surdy, Steven Swanson, Esther Swertloff, Michael Tarjan, Susan Taylor, Thad Taylor, Paul Tennet, Susie Thomas, Michael Todor, Anne Ujczo, Anthony Vaccariello, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Valantas, Ronald Valus, Phillip Vancil, Ronald Vargo, Steven Villas, Robert Virtue, Frederic Wagner, Ian Walker, Wendy Walker, Richard Wall, James Walpole, Peter Ward, Hilary Ware, Raymond Weinert, Michael Weldy, David Williams, Willie Williams, Steven Wright, Thomas Young, Joseph Yurkanian, David Yusko, Robert Zampini, Robert Zimpfer, Irma Webb, James Iacoponi, Rebecca Walker. Related document(s) #10 . (Boyle, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Kerry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10332298, with declaration filed by all plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael) Modified declaration to be refiled with original signature on 10/13/2020 (O,K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Jason W. Burge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10332149, with declaration filed by all plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael) Modified declaration to be refiled with original signature on 10/13/2020 (O,K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for attorney James R. Swanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10332143, with declaration filed by all plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael) Modified declaration to be refiled with original signature on 10/13/2020 (O,K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Caroline Hogan Paschal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10332119, with declaration filed by all plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael) Modified declaration to be refiled with original signature on 10/13/2020 (O,K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10332101, with declaration filed by all plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael) Modified declaration to be refiled with original signature on 10/13/2020 (O,K).
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. BP, PLC waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 12/24/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boyle, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. BP Corporation North America, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boyle, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Address Change Notice by Michael J. Boyle, Jr filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Boyle, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 First Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) Rebecca Barbee Walker. Filed by James Johnson, David Bridgeman, James Gilroy, Richard Sabo, Brenda Hnatiak, Christopher Drysdale, Peter Hanley, Suzanne Bassett, Alton Clark, Alan Freund, Daniel Straitiff, Raymond Weinert, Timothy Reynolds, Stephen Cossey, Robert Shockey, Bruce McCrodden, Kristina Gillespie, George Nelson, Roger Breedlove, Karen Buchanan, David Atton, James Schaefer, Terry Golden, Bill Brandt, Michael Rogers, James Hermiller, DeWanda Smith Soeder, Richard Crabtree, Denise Schiff, William Lynch, Leon Bartos, Thomas Hamilton, Robert Dyar, Douglas Farris, William Currier, Erika Denman, Susie Thomas, Ralph Rocco, Todd Korb, Mary Jane Joyce, Esther Swertloff, Ronald Vargo, Dennis Shaughnessy, James Rossett, Patricia Mesel, Richard Panek, Roger Klein, Peter Bartok, Michael LaBeau, Nancy Carter, Donald Nyberg, Brian Blazina, Cheryl Kovatch, Barbara Hunt, Holly Hansen, James Kantelis, Michael Osborne, Michael Surdy, Jack Maddux, Colin Binns, Doretha Grant, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Karen Carr, Donald Anthony, Ingrid Gwalthney, Arthur Bumpus, Vernell Calhoun, Kellie Rixse, Kenneth Alfred, Steven Benz, Eugene Braiden Rex, William Hollis, Linda O'Horo, Anthony Vaccariello, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Valantas, Paul Tennet, Carol Emeruwa, James Cundey, Joe Stamm, Robert Herrin, Judy Hanna, David Romberg, Mary Lyn Herdt, Michael Lombardi, Michael Popkin, David Yusko, Walter Ginn, Barbara Harvey, Fred Garabaldi, Lisa Mundy, Maurice Fauley, Susan Scott, Werner Sicvol, Larry Burton, Donald Debrier, Adrienne Greben, Terry Bailey, Erskine Cade, Dianne Christensen, Theodore Stagg, Robert Cameron, Michael Weldy, Michael Tarjan, Frederic Pondo, Dennis DeWilde, Michael Press, Jonathan Klement, Wendy Hileman, Edwin Kuhn, C Michelle Hall, Gerald Siira, Thomas Bond, Thomas Hower, Paul Fowler, Wendy Walker, James Neuenschwander, Karen Shanahan, Thad Taylor, Kent Huey, Donovan Kuenzli, Irma Webb, Richard Rupert, Clive Richard Maskell, Susan Caito, Doug Campbell, Steven Swanson, Toby Alfred, Vincent Buchtman, Terrance Schreiner, James Palmer, George Gonzales, Lynn Centa, Joseph Yurkanian, Michael Minor, Nicole Kantelis, Michael Morgan, Virginia Rogers, Jean Beaver, Mark Jablonski, John Calobrisi, Cynthia Brackett, James Iacoponi, Jeanette Woods Matthews, Daniel Porter, Mark Goodwin, David Bell, Jean Heflich, Thomas Standing, Anne Ujczo, Richard Lipinski, James Laubacher, Norma Fink, Hedra Harrison, Stephen Marshall, Karen DeAngelis, Willa Robinson, Tracey Rossett, David Williams, Thomas Koch, Jeffrey Foshee, Daryl Kleppin, Burrel Culp, David Gaetjens, Ronald Valus, Joseph Rothbart, Christopher McKenna, Carol Battershell, Linda Adamany, David Pessel, James Foster, Adelia Heflin, Kevin Latham, Jerry Smith, Robert Zimpfer, William Doggett, Ruth Hennie, Kay Morris, Rick Porter, Robyn Siira, Robert Pietrick, Richard Siira, Willie Williams, William Fitzgibbons, Dennis Hruska, Robert Schrag, Walter Jackson, Susan Taylor, Robert Virtue, Ian Walker, Karen Newton, Fred Schaefer, Oliver Shackelford, James Walpole, Brian Hitch, William Mooney, Laurie Brixius, Evelyn Davis, John Christopher Anderson, Daniel Flint, Edward Bonk, Edward Smith, Mary Louise Hahn, John Dueker, Terence Obeney, Thomas Young, Richard Wall, Betty Oves, Keath Headen, Pamela Goetsch, Mark Stiles, Victor Astraitis, Carmen Slominski, Courtney Kronk, Bernard Sboray, Steven Wright, Donna Meister, Jay Carstenbrock, Frank Ronald Kapcsos, Bradley Hull, Moon Poo Lew, David Catchpole, Sandra Scheman, Hilary Ware, Michael Mower, Jeffrey Conrad, John Denis, Randolph Becker, Gary Christman, Barney Dotson, Stephen McNally, Michael Garrigan, Phil Brasse, Wally Kowalski, Dennis Jonke, Frederic Wagner, Jeffrey Brame, Gerard Farkas, Rodney Butler, Kenneth Keckler, Terra Manton, Stephen Repp, Steven Villas, Richard Crosby, Bobby Scruggs, Denise Lewis, Deborah Kalmeyer, Allyson Madsen, William Christensen, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Zampini, Arshad Sheikh, Noel Bartlett, Peter Ward, Marion Harris, Matthew Fulton, Victor Adams, April Paramore, Phillip Vancil, Nancy Heinen, David Arnold, Terry LaMore, James Burroughs, John Adzima, Harrison Bubb, John McDonald, Earl Robinson, Michael Todor. (Boyle, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
September 15, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
September 15, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10263883.. Filed by James Johnson, David Bridgeman, James Gilroy, Richard Sabo, Brenda Hnatiak, Christopher Drysdale, Peter Hanley, Suzanne Bassett, Alton Clark, Alan Freund, Daniel Straitiff, Raymond Weinert, Timothy Reynolds, Stephen Cossey, Robert Shockey, Bruce McCrodden, Kristina Gillespie, George Nelson, Roger Breedlove, Karen Buchanan, David Atton, James Schaefer, Terry Golden, Bill Brandt, Michael Rogers, James Hermiller, DeWanda Smith Soeder, Richard Crabtree, Denise Schiff, William Lynch, Leon Bartos, Thomas Hamilton, Robert Dyar, Douglas Farris, William Currier, Erika Denman, Susie Thomas, Ralph Rocco, Todd Korb, Mary Jane Joyce, Esther Swertloff, Ronald Vargo, Dennis Shaughnessy, James Rossett, Patricia Mesel, Richard Panek, Roger Klein, Peter Bartok, Michael LaBeau, Nancy Carter, Donald Nyberg, Brian Blazina, Cheryl Kovatch, Barbara Hunt, Holly Hansen, James Kantelis, Michael Osborne, Michael Surdy, Jack Maddux, Colin Binns, Doretha Grant, Thomas Matlock, William Matte, Karen Carr, Donald Anthony, Ingrid Gwalthney, Arthur Bumpus, Vernell Calhoun, Kellie Rixse, Kenneth Alfred, Steven Benz, Eugene Braiden Rex, William Hollis, Linda O'Horo, Anthony Vaccariello, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Valantas, Paul Tennet, Carol Emeruwa, James Cundey, Joe Stamm, Robert Herrin, Judy Hanna, David Romberg, Mary Lyn Herdt, Michael Lombardi, Michael Popkin, David Yusko, Walter Ginn, Barbara Harvey, Fred Garabaldi, Lisa Mundy, Maurice Fauley, Susan Scott, Werner Sicvol, Larry Burton, Donald Debrier, Adrienne Greben, Terry Bailey, Erskine Cade, Dianne Christensen, Theodore Stagg, Robert Cameron, Michael Weldy, Michael Tarjan, Frederic Pondo, Dennis DeWilde, Michael Press, Jonathan Klement, Wendy Hileman, Edwin Kuhn, C Michelle Hall, Gerald Siira, Thomas Bond, Thomas Hower, Paul Fowler, Wendy Walker, James Neuenschwander, Karen Shanahan, Thad Taylor, Kent Huey, Donovan Kuenzli, Irma Webb, Richard Rupert, Clive Richard Maskell, Susan Caito, Dewey Bernu, Doug Campbell, Steven Swanson, Toby Alfred, Vincent Buchtman, Terrance Schreiner, James Palmer, George Gonzales, Lynn Centa, Joseph Yurkanian, Michael Minor, Nicole Kantelis, Michael Morgan, Virginia Rogers, Jean Beaver, Mark Jablonski, John Calobrisi, Cynthia Brackett, James Iacoponi, Jeanette Woods Matthews, Daniel Porter, Mark Goodwin, David Bell, Jean Heflich, Thomas Standing, Anne Ujczo, Richard Lipinski, James Laubacher, Norma Fink, Hedra Harrison, Stephen Marshall, Karen DeAngelis, Willa Robinson, Tracey Rossett, David Williams, Thomas Koch, Jeffrey Foshee, Daryl Kleppin, Burrel Culp, David Gaetjens, Ronald Valus, Joseph Rothbart, Christopher McKenna, Carol Battershell, Linda Adamany, David Pessel, James Foster, Adelia Heflin, Kevin Latham, Jerry Smith, Robert Zimpfer, William Doggett, Ruth Hennie, Kay Morris, Rick Porter, Robyn Siira, Robert Pietrick, Richard Siira, Willie Williams, William Fitzgibbons, Dennis Hruska, Robert Schrag, Walter Jackson, Susan Taylor, Robert Virtue, Ian Walker, Karen Newton, Fred Schaefer, Oliver Shackelford, James Walpole, Brian Hitch, William Mooney, Laurie Brixius, Evelyn Davis, John Christopher Anderson, Daniel Flint, Edward Bonk, Edward Smith, Mary Louise Hahn, John Dueker, Terence Obeney, Thomas Young, Richard Wall, Betty Oves, Keath Headen, Pamela Goetsch, Mark Stiles, Victor Astraitis, Carmen Slominski, Courtney Kronk, Bernard Sboray, Steven Wright, Donna Meister, Jay Carstenbrock, Frank Ronald Kapcsos, Bradley Hull, Moon Poo Lew, David Catchpole, Sandra Scheman, Hilary Ware, Michael Mower, Jeffrey Conrad, John Denis, Randolph Becker, Gary Christman, Barney Dotson, Stephen McNally, Michael Garrigan, Phil Brasse, Wally Kowalski, Dennis Jonke, Frederic Wagner, Jeffrey Brame, Gerard Farkas, Rodney Butler, Kenneth Keckler, Terra Manton, Stephen Repp, Steven Villas, Richard Crosby, Bobby Scruggs, Denise Lewis, Deborah Kalmeyer, Allyson Madsen, William Christensen, Humberto Vainieri, Robert Zampini, Arshad Sheikh, Noel Bartlett, Peter Ward, Marion Harris, Matthew Fulton, Victor Adams, April Paramore, Phillip Vancil, Nancy Heinen, David Arnold, Terry LaMore, James Burroughs, John Adzima, Harrison Bubb, John McDonald, Earl Robinson, Michael Todor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BP Corp. North America, Inc., #3 Summons BP, PLC) (Boyle, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Press, et al. v. BP, PLC., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Palmer
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rothbart
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Hahn
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelia Heflin
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry LaMore
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Siira
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Ware
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Burton
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burrel Culp
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Taylor
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Siira
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Butler
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pessel
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cameron
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Joyce
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bridgeman
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewey Bernu
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weldy
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Keckler
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McDonald
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael LaBeau
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Bartos
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce McCrodden
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Bartlett
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Sboray
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Weinert
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Conrad
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brackett
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Benz
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C Michelle Hall
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zampini
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Christopher Anderson
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis DeWilde
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Surdy
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Virtue
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Shaughnessy
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Manton
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burroughs
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Heinen
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen McNally
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Vainieri
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Iacoponi
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shockey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Straitiff
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mesel
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Fulton
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Beaver
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Battershell
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Garabaldi
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Shackelford
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Bartok
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Bubb
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Williams
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederic Pondo
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rogers
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Grant
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Klement
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Woods Matthews
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sabo
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garrigan
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thad Taylor
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Schiff
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kovatch
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda O'Horo
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Werner Sicvol
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Minor
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Hileman
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zimpfer
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Marshall
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moon Poo Lew
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Freund
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Gwalthney
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Obeney
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Ginn
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hanley
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davis
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Repp
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Crabtree
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Currier
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ronald Kapcsos
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Newton
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Flint
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Crosby
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jonke
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lombardi
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Huey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Braiden Rex
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Harvey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Foshee
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rossett
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Matte
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arshad Sheikh
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gonzales
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rupert
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arnold
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Panek
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hermiller
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Kleppin
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hower
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hanna
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Rogers
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Bassett
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Centa
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyson Madsen
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Foster
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Denman
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Emeruwa
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Gillespie
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tarjan
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Alfred
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kantelis
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wright
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Swanson
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Adzima
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Binns
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Buchtman
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Brixius
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Anthony
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Kuenzli
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Debrier
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Farkas
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Valus
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mooney
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Schaefer
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Romberg
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Shanahan
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeWanda Smith Soeder
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Courtney M. Werning
Represented By: David Polan Meyer
Represented By: James R. Swanson
Represented By: Caroline Hogan Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Young
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Hull
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Schreiner
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jackson
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Schaefer
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Oves
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wally Kowalski
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gaetjens
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Carr
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Maddux
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Rocco
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Scruggs
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cundey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dueker
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Doggett
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Atton
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bond
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Nelson
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Astraitis
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hedra Harrison
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hunt
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Kuhn
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erskine Cade
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hruska
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kantelis
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Golden
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Scott
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Fauley
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Brasse
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bailey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Valantas
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Laubacher
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hitch
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Smith
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Meister
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernell Calhoun
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jablonski
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stiles
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Press
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Popkin
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Ujczo
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Adamany
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lyn Herdt
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Carter
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Christensen
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tennet
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Clark
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Yurkanian
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wall
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Farris
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Latham
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Cossey
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen DeAngelis
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Caito
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo |