Pontikos v. American Medical Technology, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Pontikos
Defendant: American Medical Technology, Inc and Applied Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02163
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/17/2020 that plaintiff shall identify experts by 12/21/2020 and defendant shall identify experts by 1/4/2021. (S,KM)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/17/2020. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 11/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2021, with Responses due 3/8/2021 and Replies due by 3/15/2021. Status Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 12:00 PM and Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 12:00 PM, both to be held in Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. Discovery due by 4/12/2021. Jury Trial assigned on a two week stand-by basis beginning on 5/3/2021 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 18A before Judge James S. Gwin.(S,KM)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 Minutes of case management conference before Judge James S. Gwin held on 11/17/2020. (Court Reporter: None;Time: 35 minutes) (S,KM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by Nicole Pontikos. (Domozick, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by American Medical Technology, Inc, Applied Medical Technology, Inc. (Russo, Rina)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/23/2020 setting a case management conference on 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin.IMPORTANT: The Court requires the attendance of 1) all parties, 2) lead counsel, and 3) a representative with full settlement authority (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Appendix 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by American Medical Technology, Inc, Applied Medical Technology, Inc. (Russo, Rina)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Rina R. Russo Mark S. Fusco and Elizabeth L. Bolduc filed by on behalf of American Medical Technology, Inc, Applied Medical Technology, Inc. (Russo, Rina)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by American Medical Technology, Inc. (Russo, Rina)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Applied Medical Technology, Inc. (Russo, Rina)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Applied Medical Technology, Inc and delivered on 9/25/2020. Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to American Medical Technology, Inc and delivered on 9/25/2020. (L,Br)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Nicole Pontikos. Related document(s) #1 . (Domozick, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon American Medical Technology, Inc, Applied Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Applied Medical Technology, Inc., #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
September 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
September 24, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10290428.. Filed by Nicole Pontikos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Domozick, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pontikos v. American Medical Technology, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Bolduc
Represented By: Rina R. Russo
Represented By: Mark S. Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Bolduc
Represented By: Rina R. Russo
Represented By: Mark S. Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Pontikos
Represented By: Daniel D. Domozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?