Schmidt v. May
Petitioner: Timmothy Scott Schmidt
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 1:2020cv02251
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: William H Baughman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting respondent's #5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 29, 2020 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Harold May answer due 12/29/2020. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/26/20.(D,Ky)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 29, 2020 to answer #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Harold May. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause. (Related doc. #1 ). Respondent has 23 days from the date of this order to file an answer/return of writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/9/20. (Copy this order along with copy of petition mailed to respondent, and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 10/9/20)(D,Ky)
October 7, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 10/7/20. (K,C)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR, show cause order to be issued. Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Harold May. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
October 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,L)
October 6, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,L)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid $ 5, receipt number AOHNDC-10321928.. Filed by Timmothy S Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Praecipe) (Porter, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timmothy Scott Schmidt
Represented By: Mark E. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?