United States of America v. Unnamed Defendants Controlling a Computer Botnet
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants Controlling a Computer Botnet
Case Number: 1:2020cv02318
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Motion for preliminary injunction (Related Doc #16 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/26/2020.(L,Ja)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barker, Brendan)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: granting Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to unseal documents, also Motion to file a redacted version of the Declaration of Special Agen (Related Doc #14 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/21/2020.(L,Ja)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to unseal documents, also Motion to file a redacted version of the Declaration of Special Agent filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Special Agent, #2 Proposed Order) (H,SP)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Show cause hearing held. In attendance were Assistant U.S. Attorneys Brendan F. Barker and Steven J. Paffilas. Also in attendance was FBI Agent Matthew Kuhns. Defendants failed to appear at the hearing. Attorneys for the Government stated that they would be filing a motion to unseal the case, and a motion for preliminary injunction with a proposed order for the Court's consideration. (Court Reporter: Hedi Geizer) Time: 5 minutes. (Related document(s) 4 ) (L,Ja)
October 13, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
October 13, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 (Ex Parte) Motion to seal case filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-proposed order)(S,SR).
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Unnamed Defendants Controlling a Computer Botnet. Exempt from filing fee. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Unnamed Defendants Controlling a Computer Botnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants Controlling a Computer Botnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven J. Paffilas
Represented By: Brendan F. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?