Lovin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Roy Lovin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv02330
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: William H Baughman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. pursuant to General Order 2020-26, with Automatic Reference of Administrative Action pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (M,L)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 10/22/2020 c/o Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney (unsigned, marked C19), U.S. Attorney General (unsigned, marked C19), filed on behalf of Roy Lovin. Related document(s) #5 . (R,Ke)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons and Complaint issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 10/15/2020.(S,JM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
October 14, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 10/14/2020. (L,MI)
October 14, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,MI)
October 14, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (L,MI)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Roy Lovin. (Wilson, Rachel)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Roy Lovin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst. US Atty for ND of Ohio, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst Atty for ND of OH) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lovin
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?