Oliver v. Two Point Mortgage Trust 2017 et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Oliver
Defendant: Jocelyn Conwell, LLC, Jocelyn Conwell, U.S. Bank National Association and Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017
Case Number: 1:2020cv02427
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Copy of #4 Summons Issued, #5 Magistrate Consent Form Issued mailed to Sheila Oliver at 13400 Lambert Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio 44120 on 12/3/2020. Related document(s) #4 , #5 . (L,MI)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons issued for service upon Jocelyn Conwell, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jocelyn Conwell, #2 Summons U.S. Bank) (S,AN)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Lis Pendens Notice filed by Sheila Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(J,G)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (page one only) filed by Sheila Oliver. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(J,G)
October 22, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
October 22, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 Verified Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $400.00 Receipt # 14660126910, Filed by Sheila Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Jocelyn Conwell, #3 Summons to U.S. Bank N.A., #4 Summons to Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017, #5 Exhibit A - Amended Motion, #6 Exhibit B - Deed, #7 Affidavit of the Facts, #8 Envelope) (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Two Point Mortgage Trust 2017 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Conwell, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Conwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Stephen R. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017
Represented By: Stephen R. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?