McCoy et al v. Campo et al
Plaintiff: Laura Thompson, Maiya McCoy, Jennifer Ginley and Martin Robinson
Defendant: Sheffield Lake Police Department, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Elyria Police Department, Robert Whiting, Tony Campo, Holly Brinda, Deborah Hurlburt, John Hunter, Paul Adams, Duane Whitely, Heath Tester, Judge Chris Cook, John Doe 1-3, Ohio State Patrol, State of Ohio, FNU Fuller, Oberlin Police Department, James Simone, Attorney John Toth, John Doe, Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Officer Bashshar Wiley, Laura Dezort, Assistant Deputy FNU Hudson, Tony Cillo, Correction and Inspection Committee, Lorain County SWAT and Annette Chambers
Case Number: 1:2020cv02489
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 Acknowledgment of receipt of original state court record received on 12/16/2020 from Lorain Count Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #16 . (S,AN)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Judgment Entry For the reasons stated in the contemporaneously-filed #22 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the above-captioned case is hereby terminated and dismissed. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/18/2020. (K,K)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons stated in the Order, (1) Robinson's claims are dismissed without prejudice, and McCoy's, Thompson's, and Ginley's claims are dismissed pursuant to Apple v. Glenn; (2) Plaintiffs' Motion For a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #19 ) is denied; (3) the Motions to Dismiss filed by the following defendants are denied as moot: Tester, Hurlburt, Adams, and Lorain County Sheriff's Department (Doc. Nos. #3 , #12 ); Whitely, Whiting, and Brinda (Doc. Nos. #4 , #10 ); Hunter (Doc. Nos. #5 , #13 ); and Sheffield Lake Police Department and Campo (Doc. Nos. #6 , #14 ); (4) the Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #15 ) is denied as moot; and (5) Plaintiffs' Motion to file documents under seal (Doc. No. #17 ) is denied as moot. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/18/2020. (K,K)
December 18, 2020 Copy of #22 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #23 Judgment Entry mailed to Jennifer Ginley at 750 Oliver Street, Sheffield Lake, OH 44054; Laura Thompson T 770 Oliver Street, Sheffield Lake, OH 44054 and Maiya McCoy at 1816 Clover Avenue, Cleveland, OH 44109 on 12/18/2020. (K,K)
December 17, 2020 Filing 21 Original Summons mailed to plaintiff for service upon Paul Adams, Holly Brinda, Tony Campo, Annette Chambers, Tony Cillo, Chris Cook, Laura Dezort, FNU Fuller, John Hunter, Deborah Hurlburt, Lorain County SWAT, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Ohio State Patrol, James Simone, Heath Tester, John Toth, Duane Whitely, Robert Whiting, Bashshar Wiley. (S,AN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 Third Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Annette Chambers, Assistant Deputy Hudson, Oberlin Police Department, Officer Bashshar Whiley, John Doe Negotiator, John Doe 1-3. Filed by Laura Thompson, Maiya McCoy, Martin Robinson, Jennifer Ginley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (S,AN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Ohio Prison System and Abuse from Inmates filed by Plaintiff Martin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,AN)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 Opposition to #17 Motion to file documents under seal filed by Sheffield Lake Police Department. (Hunt, R.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to file documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Maiya McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(L,MI)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 Certified Copy of State Court documents received from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement Letter to Lorain County Court) (R,AP)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Motion to strike Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #9 filed by Tony Campo, Sheffield Lake Police Department. (Hunt, R.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint with memorandum in support filed by Tony Campo, Sheffield Lake Police Department. (Hunt, R.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant John Hunter. (Boyer, Kallen)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint with memorandum in support filed by Paul Adams, Deborah Hurlburt, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Heath Tester. Related document(s) #9 . (Williams, Terence)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Reply in support of #3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Paul Adams, Deborah Hurlburt, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Heath Tester. (Williams, Terence)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Second Amended Complaint with memorandum in support filed by Holly Brinda, Duane Whitely, Robert Whiting. (Smith, David)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Second Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) Martin Robinson and new party defendant(s) State of Ohio, Ohio State Patrol, Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Correction Inspection Committee (CICC), Lorain County SWAT, James Simone, FNU Fuller Lorain County Sheriff Deputy, Judge Chris Cook, Attorney John Toth, Laura Dezort, and Tony Cillo, filed by Jennifer Ginley, Laura Thompson, Maiya McCoy, Martin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (S,AN) (document does not contain an original signature)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 Response to #3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,AN)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Cara M. Wright filed by on behalf of Holly Brinda, Duane Whitely, Robert Whiting. (Wright, Cara)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by Tony Campo, Sheffield Lake Police Department. (Hunt, R.)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant John Hunter. (Boyer, Kallen)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Holly Brinda, Duane Whitely, Robert Whiting. (Smith, David)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Paul Adams, Deborah Hurlburt, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Heath Tester. Related document(s) #1 . (Williams, Terence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain Common Pleas, case number 20CV201124 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10394174. Filed by Heath Tester, Lorain County Sheriff's Department, Deborah Hurlburt, Paul Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Complaint, #4 Summons - File Copy, #5 Summons - Whitely, #6 Summons - Campo, #7 Pleading 2020-05-12 Court Je - Recusal of Judge Cook & Transfered to Judge Ewers, #8 Pleading 2020-05-15 Affidavit for Disqualification of Judge Cook, #9 Pleading 2020-05-22 Letter to Clerk, #10 Pleading 2020-06-09 Elyria Motion to Dismiss, #11 Pleading 2020-06-10 Campo Answer Complaint, #12 Pleading 2020-06-15 County Ds Motion to Dismiss, #13 Pleading 2020-06-15 County Ds Motion to Dismiss, #14 Pleading 2020-07-17 NOApp of Atty Rhys Brendan Cartwright-Jones as Counsel for McCoy, #15 Pleading 2020-07-21 JE granting Campo & Sheffield MFL Motion to Dismiss, #16 Pleading 2020-07-24 Motion to Withdraw Rhys Brendan Cartwright Jones as Counsel, #17 Pleading 2020-07-29 Ps MFE to Respond to Campo's Motion to Dismiss, #18 Pleading 2020-08-04 JE Granting Ps MTRespond to Ds Motion to Dismiss & Pretrial Set for 9.8.20, #19 Pleading 2020-08-24 Ps BIO to Motion to Dismiss & Request for additional Relief, #20 Pleading 2020-08-26 Reply of Defts Campo & Sheffield Lake PD to Pltf's BIO to Deft's Motion to Dismiss, #21 Pleading 2020-09-01 Ps Motion to Appear by Phone, #22 Pleading 2020-09-03 Fax Filing Conf of Ds RIS of Motion to Dismiss, #23 Pleading 2020-09-03 Fld County Ds Reply to MTD, #24 Pleading 2020-09-03 Fld NOAppearance TLW, #25 Pleading 2020-09-03 Hunter RIS of MTD, #26 Pleading 2020-09-08 JE Granting Pltf's Leave to File Amended Complaint & Status Conference Set 9-23, #27 Pleading 2020-09-21 Cartwright-Jones Motion to Withdraw) (Williams, Terence)
November 3, 2020 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 3, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy et al v. Campo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheffield Lake Police Department
Represented By: Wesley M. Kretch
Represented By: R. Todd Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyria Police Department
Represented By: David M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Whiting
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Campo
Represented By: Wesley M. Kretch
Represented By: R. Todd Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Brinda
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hurlburt
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hunter
Represented By: Kallen L. Boyer
Represented By: R. Eric Smearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Adams
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Whitely
Represented By: David M. Smith
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Tester
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Chris Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio State Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oberlin Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney John Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bashshar Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Dezort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Deputy FNU Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Cillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction and Inspection Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain County SWAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maiya McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ginley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?