Kerr v. National Funding, Inc.
Plaintiff: James P. Kerr
Defendant: National Funding, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02504
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Reply in support of #5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by National Funding, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 Opposition to #5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by James P. Kerr. (Alden, Matthew)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant National Funding, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Gentry, Boyd)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: This matter was removed to this Court on November 6, 2020. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than November 20, 2020, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/6/2020. (L,Ja)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by National Funding, Inc.. (Elliott, Zachary)
November 6, 2020 Notice by Clerk that National Funding Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 20 935456 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-10402286. Filed by National Funding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elliott, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr v. National Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary P. Elliott
Represented By: Boyd W. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Kerr
Represented By: Matthew L. Alden
Represented By: Patrick D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?