Securities and Exchange Commission v. Graham et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Larry Louis Matyas, Donald Lee Howard and Hughe Duwayne Graham
Case Number: 1:2020cv02505
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Donald Lee Howard on 12/26/2020, filed on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Fronk, Casey)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Final Judgment as Defendant Larry Louis Matyas. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/11/2020. (L,Ja)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Consent of Defendant Larry Louis Matyas filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fronk, Casey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hughe Duwayne Graham, Donald Lee Howard, Larry Louis Matyas. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hughe Duwayne Graham, #3 Summons Donald Lee Howard, #4 Summons Larry Louis Matyas) (Fronk, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Louis Matyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lee Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughe Duwayne Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Casey Fronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?