Fillinger v. Third Federal Savings and Loan Association
Plaintiff: Judy Mae Fillinger and Judy Fillinger
Defendant: Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland and Third Federal Savings and Loan Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv02537
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 Response to #13 Motion to dismiss case filed by Judy Fillinger. (Wood, John)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of case reassignment to Judge J. Philip Calabrese pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on December 7, 2020. Related document(s) #13 . (L,MI)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TFS Financial Corporation for Third Federal Savings and Loan Association filed by Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TFS Financial Corporation for Third Federal Savings and Loan Association filed by Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss case filed by Defendant Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - Incorrect event used. Initial Disclosures filed by Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric) Modified on 12/10/2020 (J,G).
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - Incorrect event used. Initial Disclosures filed by Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric) Modified on 12/10/2020 (J,G).
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Eric Deighton filed by Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (Deighton, Eric)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/21/2021 at 09:15 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/7/2020. (M,S)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Third Federal Savings and Loan Association on 11/20/2020, filed on behalf of Judy Fillinger (Wood, John)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. (J,G)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Judy Fillinger. (Wood, John)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Third Federal Savings and Loan Association filed by Judy Fillinger. (Wood, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Judy Fillinger. Related document(s) #1 . (Wood, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Judy Fillinger. Related document(s) #1 . (Wood, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
November 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
November 12, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint under the fair credit reporting act & equal credit opportunity act against Third Federal Savings and Loan Association. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10412355. Filed by Judy Mae Fillinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fillinger v. Third Federal Savings and Loan Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Federal Savings and Loan Association
Represented By: Eric T. Deighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Mae Fillinger
Represented By: John Y. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fillinger
Represented By: John Y. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?