Wiertella v. Lake County, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Wiertella
Defendant: Lt. Michelle Prather, Unknown Correctional Officers 1-15, Sgt. Matthew Darone, Patty Hammers, RN, Lt. Eric Vanjo, Karim Razmouei, MD, Sgt. Martin Bontrager, Sgt. Matthew Paul, Captain Cynthia Brooks, Dan Dunlap, Erin Boyle, RN, Sgt. Terry Tarone, Diana Snow, RN, Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel, Sabrina Watson, RN, Lt. Benjamin Longbons, Lt. Scott Simpson, Lt. Mark Soeder, Lake County, Ohio, Sgt. Michael Nahorniak, Sgt. Diana Marino and Christina Watson, RN
Case Number: 1:2020cv02739
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certified mail receipt, addressed to Sgt Matthew Darone, returned without a signature or date, and per the the USPS website "status not available" re #2 . Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Deman filed by Sgt. Martin Bontrager, Erin Boyle, RN, Captain Cynthia Brooks, Sgt. Matthew Darone, Dan Dunlap, Patty Hammers, RN, Lake County, Ohio, Lt. Benjamin Longbons, Sgt. Diana Marino, Sgt. Michael Nahorniak, Sgt. Matthew Paul, Lt. Michelle Prather, Lt. Scott Simpson, Diana Snow, RN, Lt. Mark Soeder, Sgt. Terry Tarone, Lt. Eric Vanjo, Christina Watson, RN, Sabrina Watson, RN. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Raskin, Todd) .
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lt. Mark Soeder placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656748. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sgt. Diana Marino placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724393. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lt. Eric Vanjo placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656908. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Diana Snow, RN placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656755. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lt. Benjamin Longbons placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724386. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sgt. Matthew Paul placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065724416. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lt. Scott Simpson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065656762. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Erin Boyle, RN placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065724317. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sgt. Terry Tarone placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065656731. (P,K) Modified on 1/20/2021 (P,K).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sabrina Watson, RN placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656922. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lt. Michelle Prather placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656724. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Captain Cynthia Brooks placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724331. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Patty Hammers, RN placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724362. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sgt. Michael Nahorniak placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724409 (P,K).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Dan Dunlap placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724355. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Charles E. Coulson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724379; 70081830000065656892; 70081830000065656885. (P,K) Modified on 1/20/2021 (P,K).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sgt. Matthew Darone placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certfied mail. Receipt # 7008183000065724348. (P,K)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Christina Watson, RN placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7008183000065656915. (P,K)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until January 21, 2021 to answer filed by Sgt. Martin Bontrager, Erin Boyle, RN, Captain Cynthia Brooks, Sgt. Matthew Darone, Dan Dunlap, Patty Hammers, RN, Lake County, Ohio, Lt. Benjamin Longbons, Sgt. Diana Marino, Sgt. Michael Nahorniak, Sgt. Matthew Paul, Lt. Michelle Prather, Lt. Scott Simpson, Diana Snow, RN, Lt. Mark Soeder, Sgt. Terry Tarone, Lt. Eric Vanjo, Christina Watson, RN, Sabrina Watson, RN. Related document(s) #1 . (Raskin, Todd)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 1/21/2021. Approved by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/28/2020.(S,SR)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10483267. Filed by Dennis Wiertella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet-Attachment A - Names of Defendants, #3 Summons - Benjamin Longbons, #4 Summons - Christina Watson, RN, #5 Summons - Capt. Cynthia Brooks, #6 Summons - Dan Dunlap, #7 Summons - Sgt. Diana Marino, #8 Summons - Diana Snow, RN, #9 Summons - Lt. Eric Vanjo, #10 Summons - Erin Boyle, RN, #11 Summons - Karim Razmouei, MD, #12 Summons - Lake County, Ohio, #13 Summons - Lt. Mark Soeder, #14 Summons - Sgt. Martin Bontrager, #15 Summons Sgt. Matthew Darone, #16 Summons - Sgt. Matthew Paul, #17 Summons - Sgt. Michael Nahorniak, #18 Summons - Lt. Michelle Prather, #19 Summons - Patty Hammers, RN, #20 Summons - Sabrina Watson, RN, #21 Summons - Lt. Scott Simpson, #22 Summons - Sgt. Terry Tarone, #23 Summons - Unknown Correctional Officers 1-15, #24 Summons - Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel) (Cohen, Jennifer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiertella v. Lake County, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Michelle Prather
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Matthew Darone
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hammers, RN
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Eric Vanjo
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karim Razmouei, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Martin Bontrager
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Matthew Paul
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Cynthia Brooks
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Dunlap
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Boyle, RN
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Terry Tarone
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Snow, RN
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical and Nursing Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Watson, RN
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Benjamin Longbons
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mark Soeder
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County, Ohio
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Michael Nahorniak
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Diana Marino
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Watson, RN
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wiertella
Represented By: Jennifer F. Cohen
Represented By: Daniel P. Petrov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?